DURU v. HCA-CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE-TN et al

Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, ROBERT SCHREINER, PORTER ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, KERRY KOHNEN, HENRY J. KAISER, CENTURA HEALTH SYSTEM, HENRIETTA KING, CH1 - CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVE, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP - TSPMG, KIM KAISER, HCA - CENTENNIAL DIVISION DENVER, COLO., HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN, KAISER PERMANENTE, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION and HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Case Number: 1:2018cv02762
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTIONS for Default Judgment by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (See Motions for named defendants.) (tth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTIONS for Default Judgment by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (See Motions for named defendants.) (tth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTIONS for Default Judgment by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (See Motions for named defendants.) (tth)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. See text of order for details. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order via overnight mail to the plaintiff's address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 4, 2019. (lcdlf1)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , MOTION for Sanctions by HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN, HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Zuk, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER (Zuk, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN (Zuk, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN, HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-504. (Zuk, Peter)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Persons by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (tth)
November 27, 2018 Summons (17) Issued as to CENTURA HEALTH SYSTEM, CH1 - CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVE, HCA - CENTENNIAL DIVISION DENVER, COLO., HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN, HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, HENRY J. KAISER, KIM KAISER, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, KAISER PERMANENTE, KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, HENRIETTA KING, KERRY KOHNEN, PORTER ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, ROBERT SCHREINER (2), SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP - TSPMG. (tth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTURA HEALTH SYSTEM, CH1 - CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVE, HCA - CENTENNIAL DIVISION DENVER, COLO., HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN, HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, HENRY J. KAISER, KIM KAISER, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, KAISER PERMANENTE, KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, HENRIETTA KING, KERRY KOHNEN, PORTER ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, ROBERT SCHREINER, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP - TSPMG (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095653) filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURU v. HCA-CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE-TN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SCHREINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTER ADVENTIST HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY KOHNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY J. KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURA HEALTH SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRIETTA KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH1 - CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP - TSPMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA - CENTENNIAL DIVISION DENVER, COLO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA - CORPORATE HEADQUARTER, NASHVILLE - TN
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Y. Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHONE PRESBYTERIAN ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Y. Zuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?