AGUIAR v. PARE

Plaintiff: MICHAEL AGUIAR
Defendant: KIMBERLY PARE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02777
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER advising plaintiff to respond to #4 Motion to Dismiss on or before 1/11/2019 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/6/2018. (lckbj1)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/6/2018. (lckbj1)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by KIMBERLY PARE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1)(Youssef, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (zef, )
November 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Finamore on behalf of KIMBERLY PARE (Finamore, Paul)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of District of Columbia, case number 2018-CA-0007713 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5810501 filed by KIMBERLY PARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Superior Court Documents Certification of State Court Filings, #5 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Summons, #7 Superior Court Documents Documents in Support of Complaint)(Youssef, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGUIAR v. PARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY PARE
Represented By: Matthew J. Youssef
Represented By: Paul M. Finamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL AGUIAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?