BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT v. FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT
Defendant: FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02790
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/14/2018. (lcckk3)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT (Edelman, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2018. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On December 12, 2018, the Court held a teleconference with both parties concerning Plaintiff's #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. A court reporter was present. Defense counsel indicated that the Court may not have jurisdiction over the case. By no later than 4:30 p.m. on DECEMBER 13, 2018, Plaintiff's counsel will indicate whether he agrees with defense counsel that this Court does not have jurisdiction. If Plaintiff's counsel agrees that this Court does not have jurisdiction, he will contact the Court and file a motion withdrawing the case. If Plaintiff's counsel disagrees with defense counsel, and concludes that this Court does have jurisdiction over the case, the Court will hold another teleconference between the parties on DECEMBER 13, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. During that teleconference, defense counsel will report how quickly Defendant can file the administrative record. The Court will also set a briefing schedule for the jurisdictional issue and the preliminary injunction. The Court notes that, during the teleconference, defense counsel indicated that Defendant is willing to maintain the status quo until January 31, 2019, providing the parties with additional time to fully brief the issues. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/12/2018. (lcckk3)
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 12/12/2018 at 5:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION (Simon, Jeremy)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court has arranged a teleconference on the record with the parties on DECEMBER 12, 2018, at 5:00 PM to discuss a briefing schedule. The Court asks the parties to call Chambers, preferably on the same telephone line. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 11, 2018. (lcckk1)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Edelman, Richard)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/3/18. (DM)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT.(Edelman, Richard)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5815535) filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Edelman, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/30/2018) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT v. FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYEES DIVISION/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?