HERRION, SR. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Plaintiff: ERIC HERRION, JR, LASHELLE JONES-HERRION and ERIC HERRION, SR.
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02827
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due by 3/14/2019. Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment motion due by 4/11/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/16/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/30/2019.Defendant's Cross Motion due by 5/16/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 5/30/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 6/13/2019. (zcdw)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the proposed briefing schedule, Defendant shall file the Administrative Record by 3/14/2019; Plaintiff shall file their summary judgment motion by 4/11/2019; Defendant shall oppose and file any cross-motion by 5/16/2019; Plaintiff shall file their reply and opposition by 5/30/1209; and Defendant shall reply by 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/18/2019. (lcrmc3)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order, by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Porter, Veronica)
January 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint proposed schedule due by 1/18/2019. (zcdw)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing parties to meet and confer and, no later than January 18, 2019, jointly file a proposed schedule for submission of the administrative record and summary judgment briefing. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/7/2019. (lcrmc3)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Porter, Veronica)
December 15, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/12/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/2/2019. (Jester, Elizabeth)
December 15, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 12/12/18. (Jester, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
December 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zef, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5821054) filed by ERIC HERRION, SR. et al (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons OAG, #3 Summons Mayor)(Jester, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERRION, SR. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC HERRION, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LASHELLE JONES-HERRION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC HERRION, SR.
Represented By: Elizabeth T. Jester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Veronica A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?