SHIMP v. ORACLE AMERICA, INC.

Plaintiff: MARY SHIMP
Defendant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02872
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 is vacated and reset to 2/6/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/29/19. (lsj)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Smith, Amy)
January 9, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The parties are to appear on February 4, 2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/9/2019. (lccrc1)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus T. Massey on behalf of MARY SHIMP (Massey, Marcus)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra L. Soltis on behalf of MARY SHIMP (Soltis, Debra)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
December 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrdj)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ORACLE AMERICA, INC..(Smith, Amy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ORACLE AMERICA, INC. (Smith, Amy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Smith on behalf of ORACLE AMERICA, INC. (Smith, Amy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven William Ray on behalf of ORACLE AMERICA, INC. (Ray, Steven)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 18ca7961 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5827677 filed by ORACLE AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Notice to Parties, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIMP v. ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORACLE AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Steven William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY SHIMP
Represented By: Marcus T. Massey
Represented By: Debra L. Soltis
Represented By: Paul Yoshio Kiyonaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?