YOUNG v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Plaintiff: Carolina Young
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02874
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2019. (lsj)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss on or before March 4, 2019. Further requests for extensions will be viewed with disfavor. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 01/07/2019. (lccrc3)
January 4, 2019 7 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Coel, M.)
December 28, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss by CAROLINA YOUNG (ztd)
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 1/18/2019 (lsj)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. Plaintiff's response due by January 18, 2019. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/11/2018. (lccrc3)
December 11, 2018 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
December 7, 2018 3 MOTION to Dismiss by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Berger Decl., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Coel, M.)
December 7, 2018 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Coel, M.)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 007897 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5827770 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Coel, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: M. Richard Coel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?