FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03020
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Gerber, Steven)
February 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 2/15/2019. (tj)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before February 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/1/19. (lcrc1)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC.(Byers, Larissa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019 (Stravitz, Eric)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Steven K. Gerber is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/21/18. (lcrc1)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven K. Gerber, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - 215-665-2088. Fax No. - 215-701-2088 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5853624. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Stravitz, Eric)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Stravitz, Eric)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5851657) filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stravitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Eric Neil Stravitz
Represented By: Steven K. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART BUILDERS COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Larissa N. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?