WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY v. AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA, WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY and OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv03021
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY.(Ventrell, Karen)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Ventrell on behalf of AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY (Ventrell, Karen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Old Republic Insurance Company by WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order)(White, William) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jf).
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Weschester Fire Insruance Company by WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(White, William) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jf).
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Hassell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hassell, Christopher)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019 (Hassell, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5851631) filed by WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(White, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY v. AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Karen Ventrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Karen Ventrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASHINGTON CONVENTION CENTER AUTHORITY
Represented By: William H. White, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher E. Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?