NEAL v. CONNORS

Petitioner: DENARD DARNELL NEAL
Respondent: IAN CONNORS
Case Number: 1:2018cv03080
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/13/19. (ztd)
February 7, 2019 Receipt on 02/07/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 7:19-cv-00139 sent by Western District of Virginia. (zrdj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 1/18/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Virginia. Transfer due by 2/7/2019.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/18/19. (ms)
December 17, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to IAN CONNORS (ztd) Modified on 12/31/2018 (ztd).
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616096026.) filed by DENARD DARNELL NEAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/6/2019) (ztd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEAL v. CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENARD DARNELL NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IAN CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?