WALLACE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: MARGIE WALLACE
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03140
Filed: December 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., and Imerys Talc Canada Inc. and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.. (Ondeck, Katherine)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further action from the Court or transfer by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties are relieved of any pleading, discovery, or other obligation until further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pending a ruling on such transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 14, 2019. (lcrc2)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coots Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(Coots, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (Whitelock, Julia)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
December 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj)
December 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARGIE WALLACE. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-3072 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
December 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5861810) filed by MARGIE WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Imerys Talc America, Inc., #5 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALLACE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGIE WALLACE
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Julia Kim Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?