MCCLURKIN BEY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: RICKY MCCLURKIN BEY
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv03142
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2019.) (jf)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
January 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/8/2019. (zrdj)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICKY MCCLURKIN BEY. (zmd)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by RICKY MCCLURKIN BEY. (zmd)
December 31, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/31/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLURKIN BEY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY MCCLURKIN BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?