WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC v. KANTER et al
Plaintiff: WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: TIFFANY FIELDS, MICHAEL CANTRELL, CHASTITY BROWN, JOAN H. ANDERSON, TRUSTEE, ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS CLAIMING ANY UNRECORDED INTEREST IN 1390 V STREET, N.W., UNIT 306, WASHINGTON, DC 20009, LAURA H.G. O'SULLIVAN, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), KYLE MOULDING, DANIEL KANTER, FLAGSTAR BANK, F.S.B.,, JOAN H. ANDERSON, ABBY MOYNIHAN, FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB, KYLE J. MOULDING, SQUARE and MICHAEL T. CANTRELL
3Rd Party Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: UNIT OWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF THE LANGSTON HUGHES CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER discharging #12 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/7/2019. (lckbj1)
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOAN H. ANDERSON served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #12 Order to Show Cause filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal)(Narod, Andrew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 30 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNIT OWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF THE LANGSTON HUGHES CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Narod)(Narod, Andrew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ABBY MOYNIHAN served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Order of Publication by WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Brian) Modified security, not ex parte per counsel on 2/7/2019 (ztd).
February 4, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC.(Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KYLE J. MOULDING served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL T. CANTRELL served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHASTITY BROWN served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TIFFANY FIELDS served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LAURA H.G. O'SULLIVAN served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DANIEL KANTER served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS) served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019 (Thompson, Brian)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER STRIKING #14 Disclaimer of Interest. Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the proper mechanism to respond to a complaint is with an answer or a motion to dismiss. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7, 12. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/30/2019. (lckbj1)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ABBY MOYNIHAN. (jf)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 STRIKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 1/30/19.....ANSWER to Complaint Disclaimer of Interest by CHASTITY BROWN, MICHAEL T. CANTRELL, TIFFANY FIELDS, KYLE J. MOULDING, ABBY MOYNIHAN, LAURA H.G. O'SULLIVAN.(Jules, Patrick)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Abby Moynihan, Substitute Trustee filed by WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC.(Thompson, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER requiring New Penn Financial, LLC to SHOW CAUSE on or before 2/28/2019 why this case should not be remanded to Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/28/2019. (lckbj1)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC (jf)
January 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #10 Affidavit was entered in error and refiled by the Clerk's Office under the correct category.(jf)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT / Local Rule 7.1 Certificate by WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC. (Thompson, Brian) Modified on 1/28/2019 (jf).
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Wood Thompson on behalf of WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC (Thompson, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNIT OWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF THE LANGSTON HUGHES CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION. (jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM,, Notice of QC filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Related document: #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM,, filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, Notice of QC.(Narod, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Answer to Complaint; emailed to anarod@bradley.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect document/case, 2. Please refile document, 3. Counsel must use the third-party summ
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against UNIT OWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF THE LANGSTON HUGHES CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, COUNTERCLAIM against WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Summons)(Narod, Andrew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #4 Errata (zef, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/8/2019) (zef, ).
January 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC #3 Errata filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC. (Narod, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Narod, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC (Narod, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 008496 R(RP) Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5872345 filed by NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Narod, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC v. KANTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WONDER TWINS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Brian Wood Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY FIELDS
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CANTRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASTITY BROWN
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN H. ANDERSON, TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS CLAIMING ANY UNRECORDED INTEREST IN 1390 V STREET, N.W., UNIT 306, WASHINGTON, DC 20009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA H.G. O'SULLIVAN
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE MOULDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL KANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSTAR BANK, F.S.B.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN H. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBY MOYNIHAN
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE J. MOULDING
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL T. CANTRELL
Represented By: Patrick Robert Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Justin Narod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UNIT OWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF THE LANGSTON HUGHES CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?