FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP v. DEPARTMENT OF ARMY

Plaintiff: The Federal Practice Group and FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF ARMY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 31, 2019, advising whether Defendant's production is complete and whether summary judgment briefing will be required. The parties shall meet and confer to attempt to resolve any areas of dispute before May 31, 2019. If unable to reach resolution, the parties shall propose a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/28/2019. (lcapm2)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT with Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF ARMY. (Martens, Roberto)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. (zjd)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 1, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/15/2019. (lcapm2)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DEPARTMENT OF ARMY.(Martens, Roberto)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF ARMY (Martens, Roberto)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrdj)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5873874) filed by The Federal Practice Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP v. DEPARTMENT OF ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF ARMY
Represented By: Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Federal Practice Group
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?