INTELIMAP, INC. v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Plaintiff: INTELIMAP, INC and INTELIMAP, INC.
Defendant: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 5/10/2019, (hs)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #5 Joint Motion to Stay Case, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to the parties' request for an extension of time for the defendant to file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw3)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Barnett, Kevin)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTELIMAP, INC. (Barnett, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5875413) filed by INTELIMAP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTELIMAP, INC. v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Mark Robert Tallarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTELIMAP, INC
Represented By: Kevin Travers Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTELIMAP, INC.
Represented By: Kevin Travers Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?