EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019. (hmc)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the Report on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/12/2019. (lctnm3)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Clark, Denise)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/8/2019. (lctnm3)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Attorney Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit US Attorney General Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit U.S. Department of the Interior Proof of Service)(Babcock, Hope)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zef, )
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Earth Island Institute (Babcock, Hope)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Babcock, Hope)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Earth Island Institute re #1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute.(Babcock, Hope) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/9/2019) (zef, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5875642) filed by Earth Island Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Babcock, Hope)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?