ADVANCEMENT PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Plaintiff: ADVANCEMENT PROJECT
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/12/2019 (tj)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report updating the Court on the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's requests on or before April 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/6/19. (lcrc1)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny)
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/7/2019 (tj)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by March 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/21/19. (lcrc1)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Walker, Johnny)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #2 , #3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court notes that Jessica Alcantara and Jennifer Yeu-Jeng Lai-Peterson maintain an office within the District of Columbia. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("Practice by Non-Members of the Bar of this Court"), "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of... the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the #2 , #3 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/19. (lcrc1)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Jimenez, Losmin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Yeu-Jeng Lai-Peterson, :Firm- Advancement Project, :Address- 1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-728-9557. Fax No. - 202-728-9558 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5881690. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Losmin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica Alcantara, :Firm- Advancement Project, :Address- 1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-728-9557. Fax No. - 202-728-9558 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5881663. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Losmin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5881453) filed by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons DHS, #3 Summons Summons ICE, #4 Summons Summons State Dept., #5 Summons Summons US AG, #6 Summons Summons US Attorney DC, #7 Summons Summons USCIS)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCEMENT PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCEMENT PROJECT
Represented By: Losmin Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?