PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET

Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Hammond, Derek)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Hammond, Derek)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 1/28/2019 (Smullin, Rebecca)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/14/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/15/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Smullin, Rebecca)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5883168) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons to the Office of Management and Budget, #4 Summons to the Attorney General)(Smullin, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca H Smullin
Represented By: Rebecca H. Smullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?