WILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al

Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR and BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00072
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 1/28/2019 (Bruden, Emma) Modified to correct date served on 2/28/2019 (ztd).
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 1/28/2019 (Bruden, Emma) Modified to correct date served on 2/28/2019 (ztd).
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2019. (Bruden, Emma)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2019. (Bruden, Emma)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/22/2019. (lccrc1)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Cirino, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma A. O. Bruden. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2019. (lccrc1)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Bahr, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma A. O. Bruden, :Firm- Kampmeier & Knutsen,, :Address- P.O. Box 15099 Portland, Oregon 97293. Phone No. - (503) 719-5641. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5885034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bahr, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5884974) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BLM Summons, #3 Summons DOI summons, #4 Summons US Atty summons, #5 Summons AG summons)(Bahr, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: David Alan Bahr
Represented By: Emma A.O. Bruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?