MCLEOD-SILLAH v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Plaintiff: Kimberly McLeod-Sillah
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00134
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Against Mayor and Attorney General re #1 Complaint filed by KIMBERLY MCLEOD-SILLAH. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by KIMBERLY MCLEOD-SILLAH. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Attorney General Racine)(Brown, Gary)
January 24, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, Mayor for the District of Columbia. (zmd)
January 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by Kimberly McLeod-Sillah #1 Complaint filed by KIMBERLY MCLEOD-SILLAH . (Brown, Gary) (Main
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5897540) filed by KIMBERLY MCLEOD-SILLAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant)(Brown, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCLEOD-SILLAH v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McLeod-Sillah
Represented By: Gary T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?