SUNLIGHT TRADING, LLC v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SUNLIGHT TRADING, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Defendant: 1250 4TH ST (EDENS), LLC and POTOMAC ABATEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00146
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint #10 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) Report pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3 and this Court's Standing Order [Dkt. # 6] within 14 days of the filing of the last third-party defendants' answer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/22/2019. (lcrjl2)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandza, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to 1250 4TH ST (EDENS), LLC, POTOMAC ABATEMENT, INC. (jf)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO 1250 4TH ST (EDENS), LLC AND POTOMAC ABATEMENT, INC. re #7 Third Party Complaint filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #7 Third Party Complaint filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sandza, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against 1250 4TH ST (EDENS), LLC, POTOMAC ABATEMENT, INC. filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Sandza, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/30/2019. (lcrjl2)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Sandza, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Sandza, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elizabeth B. Sandza (Sandza, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
January 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 008297 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5901508 filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 1, #2 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sandza, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUNLIGHT TRADING, LLC v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Sandza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNLIGHT TRADING, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Musolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: 1250 4TH ST (EDENS), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: POTOMAC ABATEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?