SPRUILL v. VOX MEDIA, INC.
Plaintiff: TAMRYN SPRUILL
Defendant: VOX MEDIA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference on May 8, 2019 at 10:15 am. The parties' joint report shall be filed no later than May 1, 2019 and shall include a combined schedule for discovery in both this case and related case 17-cv-1791. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/25/2019. (DAS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint by VOX MEDIA, INC..(Schwartz, Jason)
March 1, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against VOX MEDIA, INC. with Jury Demand filed by TAMRYN SPRUILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James); Modified filer at the request of counsel on 3/1/2019 (tth).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Borgen may appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/27/2019. (DAS)
February 26, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Borgen, :Firm- Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho, :Address- 300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1000, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 5107639800. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5968006. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TAMRYN SPRUILL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 and #34 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ginger Grimes and Laura Ho may appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/21/2019. (DAS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura Ho, :Firm- Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho, :Address- 300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1000, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 5107639800. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5956117. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TAMRYN SPRUILL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ginger Grimes, :Firm- Goldstein, Borgen, Dardarian & Ho, :Address- 300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1000, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 5107639800. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5956115. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TAMRYN SPRUILL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by James E Goodley on behalf of TAMRYN SPRUILL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodley, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by VOX MEDIA, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-01791. (Schwartz, Jason)
January 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Craig Schwartz on behalf of VOX MEDIA, INC. (Schwartz, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-06807. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 24, 2019 Email sent to Electronically Transfer Case to the USDC for the District of Columbia. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #27 Stipulation as modified by the court.(pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 27 Joint Stipulation & [Proposed] Order to Transfer and Allow Leave to Amend filed by Vox Media, Inc., Tamryn Spruill. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 1/23/2019) Modified on 1/24/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Remand ) filed byVox Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Naylor in Support, #2 Declaration of John Ness in Support, #3 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 1/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLANITIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #24 Stipulation.(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Vox Media, Inc., Tamryn Sprull. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KATHERINE V.A. SMITH IN SUPPORT JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service PROOF OF SERVICE)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Remand: Opposition due by 1/4/2019. Reply due by 1/25/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Tamryn Spruill. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 12/19/2018. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ginger L. Grimes, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Grimes, Ginger) (Filed on 12/5/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY, OR TRANSFER PROCEEDINGS UNTIL RESOLUTION OF FEDERAL COURT JURISDICTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #21 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Stay Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer Proceedings Until Resolution of Federal Court Jurisdiction filed by Tamryn Spruill, Vox Media, Inc. (Borgen, David) (Filed on 11/28/2018) Modified on 11/28/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 Defendant's Submission Complying with Standing Order re Removed Cases by Vox Media, Inc. (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/26/2018) Modified on 11/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/26/18. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/23/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tamryn Spruill.. (Borgen, David) (Filed on 11/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #16 FOR THE CORRECTION CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tamryn Spruill.. (Goldstein, Barry) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/28/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vox Media, Inc... (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/20/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2018. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer filed byVox Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bradley Compl., #2 Exhibit B - Bradley MTD, #3 Exhibit C - Bradley FAC, #4 Exhibit D - Bradley MTD FAC, #5 Exhibit E - Bradley Memo Op. MTD FAC, #6 Exhibit F - Bradley Order MTD FAC, #7 Exhibit G - Bradley Conditional Cert. Mot., #8 Exhibit H - Bradley Spruill Opt-In Certification)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer filed by Vox Media, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 11/30/2018. Replies due by 12/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vox Media, Inc. re 7 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Vox Media, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action with State Court (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Greta B. Williams (Williams, Greta) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine V.A. Smith (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Dooley (Dooley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vox Media, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vox Media, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Vox Media, Inc. for Vox Media, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, And Corporate Disclosure Statement (Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG 18921742. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12835928). Filed byVox Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Smith in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Smith Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Smith Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Smith Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Smith Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Smith Declaration, #7 Declaration of James Naylor in Support of Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Katherine) (Filed on 11/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRUILL v. VOX MEDIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMRYN SPRUILL
Represented By: Barry L. Goldstein
Represented By: James E Goodley
Represented By: David Borgen
Represented By: Ginger Grimes
Represented By: Laura Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOX MEDIA, INC.
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Represented By: Jason Craig Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?