KRS PROCESSING INC. v. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS et al
Plaintiff: KRS PROCESSING INC.
Defendant: WAYNE JOEL, FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, MATT DEFILIPPIS, ADAM BAUER, PAUL WILLIAMS, KEVIN GOLDBERG and AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Buckwalter on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS (Buckwalter, Jessica)
March 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/8/2019. (tj)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS re #13 Memorandum in Opposition, . (Zelenko, Benjamin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to MOTION for CM/ECF Password (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE) filed by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS. (Zelenko, Benjamin)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may have until April 8, 2019 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court does note, however, that a corporation must be represented by counsel and may not appear pro se. See, e.g., Lennon v. McClory, 3 F. Supp. 2d 1461, 1462 n.1 (D.D.C. 1998). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 27, 2019. (lcrc2)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for CM/ECF Password by KRS PROCESSING INC. (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
February 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/4/2019 (tj)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Fox/Neal Order: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 1, 2019. (lcrc2)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Benjamin L. Zelenko, #3 Exhibit A to Zelenko Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Zelenko Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Case, #6 Text of Proposed Order Transferring Case, #7 Certificate of Service)(Zelenko, Benjamin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, KEVIN GOLDBERG (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Franke, Abby)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Zelenko on behalf of AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS (Zelenko, Benjamin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, ADAM BAUER, MATT DEFILIPPIS, WAYNE JOEL, PAUL WILLIAMS re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zelenko, Benjamin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC (Franke, Abby)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA of #1 Notice of Removal by FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, KEVIN GOLDBERG. (Franke, Abby)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Flint on behalf of FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, KEVIN GOLDBERG (Flint, Justin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby A. Franke on behalf of FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, KEVIN GOLDBERG (Franke, Abby)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 8468 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5907121 filed by FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC, KEVIN GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents)(Franke, Abby) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2019) (zef, ).
January 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRS PROCESSING INC. v. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE JOEL
Represented By: Jessica L. Buckwalter
Represented By: Benjamin L. Zelenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLETCHER, HEALD & HILDRETH, PLC
Represented By: Justin Michael Flint
Represented By: Abby A. Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT DEFILIPPIS
Represented By: Jessica L. Buckwalter
Represented By: Benjamin L. Zelenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BAUER
Represented By: Jessica L. Buckwalter
Represented By: Benjamin L. Zelenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jessica L. Buckwalter
Represented By: Benjamin L. Zelenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GOLDBERG
Represented By: Justin Michael Flint
Represented By: Abby A. Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS
Represented By: Jessica L. Buckwalter
Represented By: Benjamin L. Zelenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRS PROCESSING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?