DBW PARTNERS, LLC v. BLOOMBERG, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: DBW PARTNERS, LLC
Defendant: BLOOMBERG, L.P. and BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00311
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Tara)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that the fourth cause of action for tortious interference with contract is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 21, 2019. (lcrbw1)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Williams, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, John)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #8 #9 motions to admit Robert L. Raskopf and Jessica A. Rose pro hac vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorneys referenced therein meet the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Robert L. Raskopf and Jessica A. Rose, Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10010 are ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 11, 2019. (lcrbw1)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Tara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica A. Rose, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10010. Phone No. - (212) 849-7000. Fax No. - (212) 849-7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5974351. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica A. Rose, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert L. Raskopf, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10010. Phone No. - (212) 849-7000. Fax No. - (212) 849-7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5974350. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. Raskopf, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Tara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M. Lee on behalf of BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Lee, Tara)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw1)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019 (Williams, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BLOOMBERG, L.P. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019 (Williams, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P., BLOOMBERG, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DBW PARTNERS, LLC (Williams, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5933606) filed by DBW PARTNERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bloomberg, L.P., #3 Summons Bloomberg Finance, L.P.)(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DBW PARTNERS, LLC v. BLOOMBERG, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMBERG, L.P.
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Represented By: Jessica A. Rose
Represented By: Tara M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMBERG FINANCE, L.P.
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Represented By: Jessica A. Rose
Represented By: Tara M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBW PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: John B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?