ESTATE OF TERRY HUDSON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: THERESA BUCHANAN-ROBINSON, JULIANN P MONTGOMERY, ESTATE OF PETRINA BENNETT, CORINA GARCIA BELL, ESTATE OF CLEMENTINE HUDSON WILLIAMS, CHRISTINE HUDSON COBB, ESTATE OF RONALD GARCIA, FREDRICK EVANS, III, JAN CARROLL BOHNET, RODERICK EVANS, ESTATE OF JOHANSEN BANKS, DEBORAH K BOHNET, JOANN HUDSON INGE, VERONICA MONIQUE GARCIA IBARRA, CHARMAINE JONES, ESTATE OF LOLITA WILLIAMS, MOLLIE COLLINS, CAMILLE NISICH, DENISE GARCIA, BESSIE RUTH FULTON, STEPHENY H. FAIR, GERALDINE REYNOLDS, HELEN COLEMAN, DEBRA J WHITE, ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, SR, MURIEL GARCIA, ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER, SR, ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, JR, ESTATE OF TERRY HUDSON, ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, JR, ESTATE OF PETER BANKS, MATTHEW HUDSON, ANGELA HUDSON PEAVY, FREDERICA BUCHANAN, ESTATE OF MICHAEL S FULTON, ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER, SHERRY FOSTER RICE, MICHAEL E HUDSON, SR, ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, SR, DANNIE LAMAR BANKS, GWENDOLYN FRANKLIN, ESTATE OF MATTHEW DULL HUDSON, MARK GARCIA, JANET ROBINSON, FERNANDEZ BUCHANAN, MICHAEL ALEXANDER GARCIA, TRACEY HUDSON-QUINSEY, ESTATE OF YOLANDA RUATA SMITH, ESTATE OF DONALD S FULTON, KARA D BOHNET, ANGELA NYKANEN, ESTELLA BANKS MARTIN, ALL PLAINTIFFS, DEBRA J. WHITE, JULIANN P. MONTGOMERY, DEBORAH K. BOHNET and MICHAEL E. HUDSON
Defendant: THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN and ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00377
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1602
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Robert Perles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perles, Steven)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Notice of Related Case was entered in error. Duplicate docket entry. (zef, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (ztd)
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 2/25/2019. (lsj)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Redact. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/14/2019. (lcrcl3)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ERRATA as to Caption of Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS #1 Complaint, filed by FREDRICK EVANS III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Page 1 of Caption)(Owens, Caragh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by FREDRICK EVANS III. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Owens, Caragh)
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (zef, )
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 15-cv-01074-RCL. (zef, ) Modified on 2/14/2019 (zef, ).
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 15-1074. (Owens, Caragh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Redact by DANNIE LAMAR BANKS, ESTATE OF JOHANSEN BANKS, ESTATE OF PETER BANKS, CORINA GARCIA BELL, ESTATE OF PETRINA BENNETT, DEBORAH K BOHNET, ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, SR, ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, JR, JAN CARROLL BOHNET, KARA D BOHNET, ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, SR, ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, JR, FERNANDEZ BUCHANAN, FREDERICA BUCHANAN, THERESA BUCHANAN-ROBINSON, CHRISTINE HUDSON COBB, HELEN COLEMAN, MOLLIE COLLINS, FREDRICK EVANS, III, RODERICK EVANS, STEPHENY H. FAIR, ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER, SR, ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER, GWENDOLYN FRANKLIN, BESSIE RUTH FULTON, ESTATE OF DONALD S FULTON, ESTATE OF MICHAEL S FULTON, DENISE GARCIA, ESTATE OF RONALD GARCIA, MARK GARCIA, MICHAEL ALEXANDER GARCIA, MURIEL GARCIA, ESTATE OF MATTHEW DULL HUDSON, ESTATE OF TERRY HUDSON, MATTHEW HUDSON, MICHAEL E HUDSON, SR, TRACEY HUDSON-QUINSEY, VERONICA MONIQUE GARCIA IBARRA, JOANN HUDSON INGE, CHARMAINE JONES, ESTELLA BANKS MARTIN, JULIANN P MONTGOMERY, CAMILLE NISICH, ANGELA NYKANEN, ANGELA HUDSON PEAVY, GERALDINE REYNOLDS, SHERRY FOSTER RICE, JANET ROBINSON, ESTATE OF YOLANDA RUATA SMITH, DEBRA J WHITE, ESTATE OF CLEMENTINE HUDSON WILLIAMS, ESTATE OF LOLITA WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Caragh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5946550) filed by FREDRICK EVANS, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement Ntc. of Designation of Related Cases)(Owens, Caragh) Modified on 2/14/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF TERRY HUDSON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA BUCHANAN-ROBINSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIANN P MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF PETRINA BENNETT
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORINA GARCIA BELL
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CLEMENTINE HUDSON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE HUDSON COBB
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF RONALD GARCIA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDRICK EVANS, III
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAN CARROLL BOHNET
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK EVANS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHANSEN BANKS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH K BOHNET
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN HUDSON INGE
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA MONIQUE GARCIA IBARRA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE JONES
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF LOLITA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOLLIE COLLINS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMILLE NISICH
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE GARCIA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BESSIE RUTH FULTON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHENY H. FAIR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALDINE REYNOLDS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN COLEMAN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA J WHITE
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, SR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURIEL GARCIA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER, SR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, JR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF TERRY HUDSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHN R BOHNET, JR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF PETER BANKS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW HUDSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA HUDSON PEAVY
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICA BUCHANAN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF MICHAEL S FULTON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF WILLIAM B FOSTER
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY FOSTER RICE
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E HUDSON, SR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF BOBBY BUCHANAN, SR
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNIE LAMAR BANKS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN FRANKLIN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF MATTHEW DULL HUDSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK GARCIA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET ROBINSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDEZ BUCHANAN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ALEXANDER GARCIA
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY HUDSON-QUINSEY
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF YOLANDA RUATA SMITH
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DONALD S FULTON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA D BOHNET
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA NYKANEN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTELLA BANKS MARTIN
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA J. WHITE
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIANN P. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH K. BOHNET
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. HUDSON
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?