BLYTHER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MARIE COGSDELL BLYTHER
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00383
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/19. (ztd)
March 14, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management up to and excluding trial. ( (ad)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER referring case to a magistrate judge for case management. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/14/2019. (lcjdb3)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #5 the motion for admission of Edward A. Wicklund to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Edward A. Wicklund on behalf of plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/14/2019. (lcjdb3)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edward A. Wicklund, :Firm- Olinsky Law Group, :Address- 300 S. State Street, Ste. 420, Syracuse, NY 13202. Phone No. - 315-701-5780. Fax No. - 315-701-5781 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5993803. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VICTORIA MARIE COGSDELL BLYTHER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shea, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
March 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge John D. Bates. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/27/2019. (zrdj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VICTORIA MARIE COGSDELL BLYTHER (zrdj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by VICTORIA MARIE COGSDELL BLYTHER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
February 7, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/7/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLYTHER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MARIE COGSDELL BLYTHER
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?