CARROLL v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: OLLIE L. CARROLL
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and WILLIAM P. BARR
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OLLIE L. CARROLL. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (tth)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal Document ; finding as moot #2 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 4/9/19. (lcgmh1)
April 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 5/10/19; Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 6/24/19; Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 7/8/19. (kk)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 5/10/2019. Motion for Judgment of Affirmance/Opposition to Motion for Judgment of Reversal due by 6/24/2019 Reply to Motion for Judgment of Reversal/Opposition to Motion for Judgment of Affirmance due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 4/1/19. (lcgmh1)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, Set Deadlines, Jointly Filed by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Having filed an Answer and the Administrative Record, Defendant is ORDERED to confer with Plaintiff and to file a joint proposed briefing schedule for this case on or before April 10, 2019. Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/10/2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/27/19. (lcgmh1)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12)(Littman, Matthew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL.(Littman, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 2/15/2019 (Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 22, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management up to and excluding trial. This includes, with respect to any potentially dispositive motion, the preparation of a report and recommendation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3. (zad)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2, that this action is referred to a magistrate judge, to be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office, for full case management up to and excluding trial. This includes, with respect to any potentially dispositive motion, the preparation of a report and recommendation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3. It is further ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding district judge and the assigned magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1, this action may be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties; consent of the presiding district judge is not necessary. The parties are hereby advised, however, that they may decline to consent to such a referral without adverse substantive consequences. Local Civil Rule 73.1(b). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/22/2019. (lctjk1)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 2/15/2019 (Fradette, Jacquelyn); Modified text on 2/27/2019 (tth).
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/16/2019. (Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 2/15/2019 (Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal To file corrected Complaint under Seal by OLLIE L. CARROLL (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint)(Fradette, Jacquelyn) Modified event on 2/20/2019 (znmw).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Patrick Guerrera on behalf of OLLIE L. CARROLL (Guerrera, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by OLLIE L. CARROLL #1 Complaint,, filed by OLLIE L. CARROLL. (Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn E. Fradette on behalf of OLLIE L. CARROLL (Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OLLIE L. CARROLL (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fradette, Jacquelyn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Reversal of Social Security Commissioner's Final Decision against Nancy A Berryhill Acting Commissioner Social Security Admininstration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5948944) filed by Ollie L. Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Acting Commissioner Social Security Administration, #3 Summons Attorney General, Department of Justice, #4 Summons United States Attorney's Office District of Columbia, #5 Summons Office of the Regional Chief Counsel Region III)(Fradette, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARROLL v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLLIE L. CARROLL
Represented By: Jacquelyn E. Fradette
Represented By: Mark Patrick Guerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: Matthew Jared Littman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?