FOTOHAUS LLC v. INTERWORKS, INC.

Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS LLC and FOTOHAUS, LLC
Defendant: INTERWORKS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00425
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 4/24/2019. (mac)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/28/2019. (lcegs2)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by INTERWORKS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/28/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to INTERWORKS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERWORKS, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5956172) filed by FOTOHAUS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Deal, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOTOHAUS LLC v. INTERWORKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Attison L. Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS LLC
Represented By: David C. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOTOHAUS, LLC
Represented By: David C. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?