MUTHANA v. POMPEO et al Featured Case

The father of an Alabama woman who traveled to Syria to join ISIS has filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration over its decision to rescind her US citizenship. The lawsuit, which names President Trump, Secretary of State Mike Pompeo, and Attorney General William Barr, asks the court to prevent the federal government from depriving the daughter of her citizenship and to require the government to allow her to return to the country.

Plaintiff: AHMED ALI MUTHANA
Defendant: MICHAEL POMPEO, WILLIAM PELHAM BARR and DONALD J. TRUMP
Undetermined: Secretary of State MICHAEL R. POMPEO, Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR and President of US DONALD J. TRUMP
Amicus Curiae: CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00445
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carilli, Joseph)
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 ERRATA with Corrected Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by AHMED ALI MUTHANA 24 Response to motion, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition)(Jump, Christina)
May 10, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Inddex, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Plaintiff, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Raya B. Clinton Reply Brief, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 7 FAM 1100, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jump, Christina)
May 7, 2019 Filing 23 AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE. (ztd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 22 Unopposed Motion of Immigration Reform Law Institute for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute in Support of Defendants, ECF No. 22-1, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 7, 2019. (lcrbw2)
May 7, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief)(Hajec, Christopher)
May 6, 2019 Filing 21 AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (ztd)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 20 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Immigration Studies, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Immigration Studies in Support of Defendants/Respondents, ECF No. 20-1, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 6, 2019. (lcrbw2)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Axelrod, Julie)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Carilli, Joseph). Added MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on 4/29/2019 (ztd).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's request for expedited consideration of this case raised in the plaintiff's 1 Expedited Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 11, 2019. (lcrbw2)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on March 4, 2019. Page Numbers: 1 - 46. Date of Issuance: March 4, 2019. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2019.(Hook, Jeff)
March 4, 2019 Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Oral Argument held on 3/4/2019. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Expedited Consideration; heard and denied. (Court Reporter Jeff Hook) (hs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE. (ztd)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's 11 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence in Support of Defendants/Respondents, ECF No. 11-1, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's 13 Request to Appear Telephonically, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the request is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John Eastman may appear telephonically at the hearing scheduled for March 4, 2019. The Clerk of the Court shall provide Dr. Eastman with instructions for his telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's 12 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John C. Eastman, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Chapman University Fowler School of Law, One University Drive, Orange, CA 92866, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Carilli, Joseph)
March 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Request to Appear Telephonically by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence (Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 3/14/2019 (znmw).
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Complaint,, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (ztd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John C. Eastman, :Firm- Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, :Address- One University Drive, Orange, CA 92866. Phone No. - 877-855-3330 ext 2. Fax No. - 714-844-4817 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5976684. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Eastman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Axelrod, Julie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Axelrod, Julie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Scott)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Expedited Complaint for Declaratory, Injunctive and Mandamus Relief, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Expedited Complaint for Declaratory, Injunctive and Mandamus Relief, ECF No. 9-2, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file a response to the plaintiff's Complaint, if any, on or before March 4, 2019, at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 1, 2019. (lcrbw2)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law by AHMED ALI MUTHANA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Law)(Swift, Charles)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP (Carilli, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Davidson Swift on behalf of AHMED ALI MUTHANA (Swift, Charles)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 26, 2019. (lcrbw2)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Hearing, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the plaintiff's Expedited Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus on March 4, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 26, 2019. (lcrbw2)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM PELHAM BARR served on 2/25/2019; MICHAEL POMPEO served on 2/25/2019; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 2/25/2019 (Jump, Christina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Correcting Page 1 of Complaint and Requests for Summons by AHMED ALI MUTHANA #1 Complaint,, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: #1 Errata Revised Page One of Complaint, #2 Errata Summons)(Jump, Christina)
February 22, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP (zef, )
February 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to Expedite by AHMED ALI MUTHANA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jump, Christina)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Expedited Relief against WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5959743) filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Birth Certificate, #5 Exhibit United States Mission to United Nations Letter, #6 Exhibit Department of State Letter, #7 Exhibit Letter from Charles D. Swift, #8 Exhibit Letter from U.S. Attorney ND AL)(Jump, Christina)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Expedited Relief against WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5959743) filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit A to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Birth Certificate, # 5 Exhibit United States Mission to United Nations Letter, # 6 Exhibit Department of State Letter, # 7 Exhibit Letter from Charles D. Swift, # 8 Exhibit Letter from U.S. Attorney ND AL)(Jump, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUTHANA v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Secretary of State MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: President of US DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMED ALI MUTHANA
Represented By: Christina A. Jump
Represented By: Charles Davidson Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL POMPEO
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM PELHAM BARR
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE
Represented By: John C. Eastman
Represented By: Julie B. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?