MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00457
Filed: February 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 5/20/2019. (zcdw)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's #6 Status Report, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff shall submit another status report on or before May 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 16, 2019. (lcdlf2)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Hoppe, Jon)
February 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/18/2019 (zcdw)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 28, 2019. (lcdlf2)
February 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
February 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
February 24, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Hoppe, Jon)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
February 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5963032) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Jon A. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?