BROWN et ux. v. AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. et al.
Plaintiff: TYRONE F BROWN, BLONDIE BROWN and TYRONE F. BROWN
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC., ALFA LAVAL, INC., DAVIS INSTRUMENT AND VALVES, INC., I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC., CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY, RUSKIN COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE, CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION, CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., CRANE COMPANY, INC., COOPER US, INC., VIAD CORP., AC&R INSULATION CO., INC., ALCOA INC., ASCO VALVES, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, MCWANE, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC and VELAN VALVE CORP.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00511
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #269 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Carl Robert Schwertz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Clark-Reliance Corp. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/2019. (lcapm2)
November 14, 2019 Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carl R.Schwertz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6562769. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Carl Schwertz, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Joshua)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #268 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bobbie R. Bailey is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/13/2019. (lcapm2)
November 13, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bobbie R. Bailey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6558807. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Garber, Jason)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #267 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jackalyn A. Olinger Rochelle is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/07/2019. (lcapm2)
November 7, 2019 Filing 267 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jackalyn A. Olinger Rochelle, for Plaintiffs Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6520271. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery shall conclude by 1/31/2020. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is hereby extended to January 31, 2020, and the Post-Discovery Status Conference is reset for February 11, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/04/2019. (lcapm2)
November 1, 2019 Filing 265 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by VIAD CORP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gile, Dawn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant CBS Corporation. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/24/2019. (lcapm2)
October 24, 2019 Filing 263 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CBS Corporation by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 262 RULE 26a2 STATEMENT. (Phillips, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 261 Memorandum in opposition to re #259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum filed by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 First Amd Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 Vol 1 Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 Pl Disc Resp, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 Vol 2 Depo Transcript, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 CBS Ans to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 CBS Ans to Discovery, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 260 STIPULATION re #259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN. (Brown, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On September 19, 2019, Defendant CBS Corporation of Delaware moved to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, ECF No. #259 . Though 14 days have passed, Plaintiffs have yet to respond to that motion. Plaintiffs are advised that the failure to respond to Defendant's motion by October 11, 2019, may result in the court granting the motion and dismissing Defendant from this action. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/08/2019. (lcapm2)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the telephonic conference held today, October 8, 2019, Defendant I.M.O. Industries, Inc. shall (1) produce certifications to master and specific interrogatory responses by October 14, 2019, and (2) produce responsive records by October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/08/2019. (lcapm2)
September 19, 2019 Filing 259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum by CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certification, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maisano, Clare)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #257 Voluntary Dismissal of John Crane Inc.'s Cross Claims against all Co-Defendants; and all Co-Defendants' Cross-Claims against John Crane Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/17/2019. (lcapm2)
September 17, 2019 Filing 257 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #255 Voluntary Dismissal of Cross Claims By and Against Gardner Denver. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/26/2019. (lcapm3)
August 21, 2019 Filing 255 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal)(Goldberg, Terri)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #251 Motion to Dismiss Complaint against defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/16/2019. (lcapm2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 253 Joint STATUS REPORT re Status of Discovery by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN. (Brown, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel A. Brown (Brown, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 251 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Brown, Daniel)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of AC&R Insulation Co., Inc.'s Cross Claims Against All Other Defendants and All Other Defendants' Cross Claims Against AC&R Insulation Co., Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/9/2019. (lcapm2)
August 8, 2019 Filing 248 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #246 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Krafft-Murphy Corporation's Cross Claims Against All Other Defendants and All Other Defendants' Cross Claims Against Krafft-Murphy Corporation. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/6/2019. (lcapm2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 246 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims Against Krafft-Murphy Company by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY(and as ) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacDonald, Neil)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of McWane, Inc.'s Cross Claims Against All Other Defendants and All Other Defendants' Cross Claims Against McWane, Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/5/2019. (lcapm2)
August 5, 2019 Filing 244 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Haslup, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 243 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims by MCWANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loker, Frank)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #242 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Arconic Inc.'s Cross Claims Against All Other Defendants and All Other Defendants' Cross Claims Against Arconic. All of Arconic's cross claims against all other Defendants and all of other Defendants' cross claims against Arconic are hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(c). Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/19/2019. (lcapm2)
July 18, 2019 Filing 242 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims by ALCOA INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due by 8/5/2019. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due by 10/22/2019. (zjd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #241 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports. The parties are reminded that under the court's scheduling order that, at this juncture, they do not need to request extensions of time for any deadlines other than discovery cut-off and the post-discovery conference. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/12/2019. (lcapm2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 241 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' 26(a)(2) disclosures by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #238 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Gardner Denver, Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/11/2019. (lcapm2)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #237 and #239 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys James O. Spiker IV and Joel D. Newport are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/11/2019. (lcapm2)
July 10, 2019 Filing 239 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joel D. Newport, :Firm- Moore & Jackson LLC, :Address- 305 Washington Ave., Ste. 401, Towson, MD 21204. Phone No. - (410) 583-5241. Fax No. - (410) 583-7519 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6245761. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC.(Individually and as ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garber, Jason)
July 10, 2019 Filing 238 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Dismissal)(Goldberg, Terri)
July 10, 2019 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- JamesO. Spiker IV, :Firm- Semmes, Bowen & Semmes, :Address- 25 S. Charles Street, Suite 1400, Baltimore, MD 21201. Phone No. - 4105395040. Fax No. - 4105395223 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6245524. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #232 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Goulds Pumps LLC. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2019. (lcapm2)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #231 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Alcoa, Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2019. (lcapm2)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #230 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of McWane, Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2019. (lcapm2)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #229 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Krafft-Murphy Corporation. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2019. (lcapm2)
July 8, 2019 Filing 232 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Dismissal of Defendant Goulds Pumps)(Luxton, Steven)
July 8, 2019 Filing 231 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by ALCOA INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION to Dismiss by MCWANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loker, Frank)
July 8, 2019 Filing 229 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacDonald, Neil)
July 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #216 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew D. Joss is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/7/2019. (lcapm2)
July 5, 2019 Filing 228 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by VELAN VALVE CORP.. (Taddeo, Anthony)
July 5, 2019 Filing 227 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Fitzpatrick, Brendan); Modified event and text on 7/8/2019 (tth).
July 5, 2019 Filing 226 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by VELAN VALVE CORP. (Taddeo, Anthony) Modified event and text on 7/8/2019 (tth).
July 5, 2019 Filing 225 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Goldberg, Terri) Modified event and text on 7/8/2019 (tth).
July 5, 2019 Filing 224 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 Arconic Inc. f/k/a Alcoa Inc. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 223 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 of Crane Co. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 222 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 of Foster Wheeler LLC by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 221 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Hurley, Timothy) Modified event and text on 7/8/2019 (tth).
July 5, 2019 Filing 220 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT by WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Goldberg, Terri) Modified event and text on 7/8/2019 (tth).
July 4, 2019 Filing 219 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Garber, Jason)
July 3, 2019 Filing 218 STIPULATION to Extend Time by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Kornobis, Theodore)
July 3, 2019 Filing 217 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Phillips, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew D. Joss, :Firm- Herbert & Satterwhite, P.C., :Address- 1800 Bayberry Court, Suite 302, Richmond VA 23226. Phone No. - (804) 554-1800. Fax No. - (804) 554-1801 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6234109. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VELAN VALVE CORP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taddeo, Anthony)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #145 Motion to Dismiss Crossclaims Against Asco Valves, Inc. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/03/2019. (lcapm3)
July 2, 2019 Filing 215 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 of Crane Company by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(Goldberg, Terri) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct linkage (zrdj).
July 2, 2019 Filing 214 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 213 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 212 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
July 2, 2019 Filing 211 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
July 2, 2019 Filing 210 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 209 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 208 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 of Foster Wheeler, LLC by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(Goldberg, Terri)
July 2, 2019 Filing 207 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 of Arconic, Inc. by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(Goldberg, Terri)
July 2, 2019 Filing 206 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 of Foster Wheeler, LLC by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
July 2, 2019 Filing 205 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 of Crane Company by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
July 2, 2019 Filing 204 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 of Arconic, Inc. by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
July 2, 2019 Filing 203 Defendant Arconic, Inc. F/K/A Alcoa Inc's ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 by ALCOA INC..(Whitelock, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 202 Defendant Arconic, Inc. F/K/A Alcoa Inc's ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by ALCOA INC..(Whitelock, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE by ASCO VALVES, INC. re #145 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaims (Phillips, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #193 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant McWane's Answers to Plaintiffs' Master Interrogatories and Fact Witness Disclosures are now due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/1/2019. (zjd)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of John Crane Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/01/2019. (lcapm1)
July 1, 2019 Filing 199 Joint MOTION to Dismiss John Crane Inc. by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurley, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 198 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 by VELAN VALVE CORP..(Taddeo, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 197 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 by VELAN VALVE CORP..(Taddeo, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 196 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
July 1, 2019 Filing 195 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
June 28, 2019 Filing 194 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 by VELAN VALVE CORP..(Taddeo, Anthony)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #186 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against AC&R Insulation Co., only, are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/28/2019. (lcapm2)
June 28, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION (STIPULATION) for Extension of Time by MCWANE, INC. (Loker, Frank) Modified on 6/28/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
June 28, 2019 Filing 192 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Luxton, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 191 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO. by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 190 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 189 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 OF DEFENDANT ARCONIC, INC. F/K/A ALCOA INC. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 188 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 187 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 186 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 185 ANSWER to Crossclaim #170 of Foster Wheeler LLC by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC..(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 184 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 of Crane Company, Inc. by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC..(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 183 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 of Arconic Inc. by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC..(Fitzpatrick, Brendan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 182 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VELAN VALVE CORP. (Taddeo, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrea E. Cook is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/19/2019. (lcapm2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrea Cook, :Firm- Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, :Address- 2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4100W, Dallas, Texas 75201. Phone No. - 214-231-4600. Fax No. - 214-461-4053 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6200093. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALCOA INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrea Cook, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
June 19, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony B. Taddeo, Jr on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORP. (Taddeo, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 179 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by VELAN VALVE CORP..(Taddeo, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. Attorney Patrick Dugan McKevitt terminated. (McKevitt, Patrick)
June 18, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AC&R INSULATION CO., INC.. Attorney Geoffrey S Gavett and Nicholas James Phillips terminated. (Gavett, Geoffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Woodward Sheehan on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (Sheehan, Peter)
June 18, 2019 Filing 175 ANSWER to Crossclaim #173 of Crane Company, Inc. by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(Phillips, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Filing 174 ANSWER to Crossclaim #171 of Arconic Inc f/k/a Alcoa, Inc. by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(Phillips, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 173 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
June 17, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Answers to Crossclaims by ALCOA INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 171 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by ALCOA INC..(Whitelock, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 170 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(Phillips, Scott)
June 11, 2019 Filing 169 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (Phillips, Scott)
June 11, 2019 Filing 168 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC.(Phillips, Scott)
June 11, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Henderson Fitzpatrick on behalf of AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Fitzpatrick, Brendan) (Main Document 167 replaced on 6/14/2019) (zjf).
June 5, 2019 Filing 166 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
June 4, 2019 Filing 165 SUMMONS(2) Issued Electronically for the Amended Complaint as to FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, VELAN VALVE CORP.. (ztd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 164 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by ALCOA INC..(Whitelock, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 163 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 162 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 161 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
May 30, 2019 Filing 160 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC.(Luxton, Steven)
May 29, 2019 Filing 159 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC..(Gavett, Geoffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 158 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 157 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(Brisker, Malcolm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 156 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Brisker, Malcolm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 155 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE.(Maisano, Clare)
May 22, 2019 Filing 154 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 153 ANSWER to #152 Amended Complaint,, by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
May 17, 2019 Filing 152 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AC&R INSULATION CO., INC., ALCOA INC., CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE, CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY, INC., DAVIS INSTRUMENT AND VALVES, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN CRANE, INC., KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY, MCWANE, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORP., VIAD CORP., WARREN PUMPS, LLC filed by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN.(zjf)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Consent #150 Motion. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/17/2019. (lcapm2)
May 16, 2019 Filing 150 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Summons FW and VV Summonses, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 149 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Fennell, Stephen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Fennell on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Fennell, Stephen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(Fennell, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RUSKIN COMPANY (Luxton, Steven)
May 8, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaims by ASCO VALVES, INC.(Individually and as) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Scott)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #143 Motion to Dismiss Complaint against defendant ASCO Valves, Inc. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/6/2019. (lcapm2)
May 6, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss Asco Valves, Inc. by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 142 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to DAVIS INSTRUMENT AND VALVES, INC.: Delaware Business Incorporated, Inc. 3422 Old Capitol Trl. Suite 700, Wilmington, DE 19808; Type of Document Returned: Notice to Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zef, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALCOA INC.. Attorney Katherine Ondeck terminated. (Ondeck, Katherine)
April 25, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Kim Whitelock on behalf of ALCOA INC. (Whitelock, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 139 ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 25, 2019 Filing 138 ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 25, 2019 Filing 137 ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 136 ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 135 ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 134 ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 133 ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 24, 2019 Filing 132 ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 131 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 130 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 129 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 128 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 127 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 17, 2019 Filing 126 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 12, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Cooper Industries, LLC (Brown, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 4/10/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Cross and/or Third-Party Complaints due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 12/1/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiffs shall respond to master interrogatories from the District of Columbia Superior Court asbestos litigation on or before May 13, 2019; Plaintiffs shall identify all fact witnesses who may testify at trial on or before June 3, 2019. Plaintiffs shall specify and provide addresses for witnesses whom Plaintiffs cannot voluntarily produce for deposition without a subpoena from Defendants; the last day to file cross-and/or third-party complaints without first obtaining leave of court shall be June 17, 2019; Defendants shall respond to master interrogatories from the District of Columbia Superior Court asbestos litigation on or before July 5, 2019;Defendants shall identify all fact witnesses who may testify at trial and specifically designate those witnesses who will offer product identification information on or before July 5, 2019. Defendants shall specify and provide addresses for witnesses whom they cannot voluntarily produce for deposition without subpoena;Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are due on July 15, 2019. Plaintiffs shall produce to Defendants all medical imaging and pathology materials in their possession or control; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before August 15, 2019; the deadline for depositions of product identification fact witnesses other than Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses shall be September 13, 2019; Defendants Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be due on or before October 1, 2019; all discovery shall conclude on December 1, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for December 3, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/10/2019. (lcapm2)
April 9, 2019 Filing 123 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 of Defendant Viad Corp. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 122 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 of Defendant Krafft-Murphy Company by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 121 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 120 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 of Defendant Gardner Denver Inc. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 119 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 9, 2019 Filing 118 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 9, 2019 Filing 117 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #116 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (jf)
April 8, 2019 Filing 116 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Luxton on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, RUSKIN COMPANY (Luxton, Steven) Modified on 4/8/2019 (jf).
April 5, 2019 Filing 115 ANSWER to Crossclaim #114 of Viad Corp. by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
April 5, 2019 Filing 114 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
April 5, 2019 Filing 113 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 5, 2019 Filing 112 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 111 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 110 ANSWER to Crossclaim #109 of Krafft-Murphy Company by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #108 Answer to Crossclaim was entered in error at the request of counsel. (tth)
April 5, 2019 Filing 109 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
April 5, 2019 Filing 108 ENTERED IN ERROR..... ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 of MCWANE, INC. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil); Modified on 4/5/2019 (tth).
April 4, 2019 Filing 107 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 105 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 102 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 by CRANE COMPANY, INC..(Kornobis, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
April 4, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION.(Silver, Robin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE Consent to Meet & Confer Statement by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC. re #96 Meet and Confer Statement (Garber, Jason)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/3/2019. (lcapm2)
April 3, 2019 Filing 96 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(MacDonald, Neil)
April 1, 2019 Filing 95 RESPONSE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs Complaint and Any and All Cross-Claims filed by BLONDIE BROWN, TYRONE F. BROWN. (Brown, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket No. re #92 Answer to Crossclaim was entered in error and refiled. (See Docket Entry #93 to view document) (jf)
March 28, 2019 Filing 94 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 28, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 28, 2019 Filing 92 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jf).
March 28, 2019 Filing 91 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
March 28, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 of Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
March 28, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 88 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #85 , #53 , #45 , #80 by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC..(Gavett, Geoffrey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 87 ANSWER to Crossclaim #85 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 28, 2019 Filing 86 ANSWER to Crossclaim #80 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 27, 2019 Filing 85 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by WARREN PUMPS, LLC.(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 Union Carbide Corp. by WARREN PUMPS, LLC(Individually and as ).(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 McWane, Inc. by WARREN PUMPS, LLC(Individually and as ).(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 IMO Industries by WARREN PUMPS, LLC(Individually and as ).(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 CBS Corporation by WARREN PUMPS, LLC(Individually and as ).(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 80 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 79 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 Union Carbide Corp. by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 McWane, Inc. by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 IMO Industries by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 of CBS Corporation by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Goldberg, Terri)
March 26, 2019 Filing 75 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 of Defendant CBS Corporation by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 74 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 73 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 of Defendant McWane, Inc. by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 72 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by JOHN CRANE, INC..(Hurley, Timothy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Alfa Laval Inc. (O'Brien, Eileen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(Haslup, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 of CBS Corporation by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY(and as ).(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 of Union Carbide Corporation by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY(and as ).(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 of IMO Industries, Inc. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY(and as ).(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 of McWane, Inc. by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY.(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 of CBS Corporation by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 of IMO Industries, Inc. by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 of Union Carbide Corporation by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 62 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 of McWane, Inc. by VIAD CORP..(MacDonald, Neil)
March 21, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 21, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to Crossclaim #53 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 21, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to Crossclaim #45 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 21, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to Crossclaim #43 by ASCO VALVES, INC..(Phillips, Scott)
March 21, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing of Answer to Complaint by WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brisker, Malcolm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm S. Brisker on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 55 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE (Maisano, Clare)
March 20, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #45 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #45 , ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #45 by CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE.(Maisano, Clare)
March 20, 2019 Filing 53 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE.(Maisano, Clare)
March 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare M. Maisano on behalf of CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE (Maisano, Clare)
March 19, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #45 by ALCOA INC..(Ondeck, Katherine) Modified docket text on 3/19/2019 (znmw).
March 19, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Haslup on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Haslup, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 49 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Haslup, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 48 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 47 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Brisker, Malcolm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Crossclaim #4 , #43 , #45 by GARDNER DENVER, INC..(Brisker, Malcolm) Modified docket text on 3/19/2019 (znmw). Modified on 3/20/2019 docket link (jf).
March 15, 2019 Filing 45 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION.(McKevitt, Patrick)
March 14, 2019 Filing 44 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC., I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC. (Garber, Jason)
March 14, 2019 Filing 43 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC..(Garber, Jason)
March 14, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 by I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC..(Garber, Jason)
March 14, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Garber on behalf of I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC. (Garber, Jason)
March 13, 2019 Filing 40 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of ITT Inc by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC (Luxton, Steven)
March 13, 2019 Filing 39 Master ANSWER to Crossclaim #4 and/or Third Party Complaints filed by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC.(Luxton, Steven)
March 13, 2019 Filing 38 First ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by GOULDS PUMPS, LLC.(Luxton, Steven)
March 13, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn D. Gile on behalf of CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (Gile, Dawn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. MacDonald on behalf of CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (MacDonald, Neil)
March 13, 2019 Filing 35 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (MacDonald, Neil)
March 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs Complaint and Any and All Cross-Claims by CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MacDonald, Neil)
March 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Hamilton Phillips on behalf of ASCO VALVES, INC. (Phillips, Scott)
March 12, 2019 Filing 32 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Gavett, Geoffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 31 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION (Silver, Robin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 30 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CRANE COMPANY, INC. (Kornobis, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Lawrence Kornobis on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, INC. (Kornobis, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (McKevitt, Patrick)
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Dugan McKevitt on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (McKevitt, Patrick)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests Johnson Controls International plc by RUSKIN COMPANY (Luxton, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Luxton on behalf of RUSKIN COMPANY (Luxton, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James Charles Mehigan on behalf of ALCOA INC. (Mehigan, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALCOA INC. (Ondeck, Katherine)
March 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Ondeck on behalf of ALCOA INC. (Ondeck, Katherine)
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F. Kahn on behalf of CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION (Kahn, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Silver on behalf of CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION (Silver, Robin)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #18 Notice of Appearance; emailed to jkahn@milesstockbridge.com, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please refile document, 3. Each counsel must use their assigned login/password for efiling; review LCvR 5.4 (zjf, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McDevitt Hurley on behalf of JOHN CRANE, INC. (Hurley, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F. Kahn on behalf of CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION (Kahn, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey S Gavett on behalf of AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Gavett, Geoffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Phillips on behalf of AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. (Phillips, Nicholas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F. Kahn on behalf of MCWANE, INC. (Kahn, Joshua) Modified event title on 3/5/2019 (znmw).
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua F. Kahn on behalf of MCWANE, INC. (Kahn, Joshua)
March 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Remand due by 3/22/2019. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter is set for April 10, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10. If any party intends to file a motion for remand, such motion shall be filed no later than March 22, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/2019. (lcapm2)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY (MacDonald, Neil)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VIAD CORP. (MacDonald, Neil)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn D. Gile on behalf of KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY (Gile, Dawn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn D. Gile on behalf of VIAD CORP. (Gile, Dawn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. MacDonald on behalf of KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY (MacDonald, Neil)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. MacDonald on behalf of VIAD CORP. (MacDonald, Neil)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCWANE, INC. (Loker, Frank)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by MCWANE, INC..(Loker, Frank)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
March 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Notice of Removal (with addresses of the parties) by VIAD CORP.. (MacDonald, Neil)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 000603 A Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5970899 filed by VIAD CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Neil J. MacDonald, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Superior Court Documents, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacDonald, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN et ux. v. AC&R INSULATION CO., INC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Malcolm S. Brisker
Represented By: Terri L. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS INSTRUMENT AND VALVES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.M.O. INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Jason S Garber
Represented By: Joel D. Newport
Represented By: Jason S Garber, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPMAN VALVE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAFFT-MURPHY COMPANY
Represented By: Neil J. MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn D. Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSKIN COMPANY
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Michael L. Haslup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Clare M. Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joshua F. Kahn
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTROLS, HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC.
Represented By: Neil J. MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn D. Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Brown
Represented By: Timothy McDevitt Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Theodore Lawrence Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP.
Represented By: Neil J. MacDonald
Represented By: Dawn D. Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AC&R INSULATION CO., INC.
Represented By: Geoffrey S Gavett
Represented By: Nicholas James Phillips
Represented By: Brendan Henderson Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA INC.
Represented By: Julia Kim Whitelock
Represented By: James Charles Mehigan
Represented By: Katherine Ondeck
Represented By: Andrea Cook
Represented By: Katherine C. Ondeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCO VALVES, INC.
Represented By: Scott Hamilton Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Malcolm S. Brisker
Represented By: Terri L. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCWANE, INC.
Represented By: Frank Ford Loker
Represented By: Joshua F. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick Dugan McKevitt
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Stephen A. Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Represented By: Scott Hamilton Phillips
Represented By: James O. Spiker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP.
Represented By: Anthony B. Taddeo, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D. Joss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE F BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLONDIE BROWN
Represented By: Eileen Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Daniel A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE F. BROWN
Represented By: Eileen Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Daniel A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?