VAGABOND RENTAL & SERVICES, LLC v. HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC
Plaintiff: Vagabond Rental & Services, LLC
Defendant: Hamilton Investments, Inc. d/b/a BTM Facility Services and HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00753
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal 12(b)(2) filed by HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC.. (McClanahan, Dirk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal 12(b)(2) in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by VAGABOND RENTAL & SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Boone, Richard)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal 12(b)(2) by HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support)(McClanahan, Dirk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019 (Boone, Richard)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA correcting Complaint by VAGABOND RENTAL & SERVICES, LLC #1 Complaint, filed by HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC.. (Boone, Richard)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Boone, Jr on behalf of Vagabond Rental & Services, LLC (Boone, Richard)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Vagabond Rental & Services, LLC (Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton Investments, Inc. d/b/a BTM Facility Services with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6006901) filed by Vagabond Rental & Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Hanrahan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAGABOND RENTAL & SERVICES, LLC v. HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Investments, Inc. d/b/a BTM Facility Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Dirk McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vagabond Rental & Services, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Hanrahan
Represented By: Richard W. Boone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?