CRABTREE v. GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. CRABTREE
Defendant: GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00763
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT BY CONSENT, entered on Count I of the Complaint in favor of the Plaintiff Michael A. Crabtree, as Chief Executive Officer of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, and against Defendant Gateway Hose & Fittings LLC, for the sum of $77,054.43, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/19. (dot)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment and to Close Case by MICHAEL A. CRABTREE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Gilligan, Charles). Added MOTION on 5/29/2019 (ztd).
May 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Notice of Dismissal due by 5/17/2019, if not, Answer to Complaint due by 5/27/2019.(dot)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/3/2019. (lcckk3)
April 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/6/2019. (dot)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Defendant's registered agent at the address provided for Defendant in the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/15/2019. (lcckk3)
April 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/12/2019 for defendant (ztd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Gilligan, Charles) Modified to indicate correct party served on 4/4/2019 (ztd).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/19. (DM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6009351) filed by MICHAEL A. CRABTREE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gilligan, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRABTREE v. GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEWAY HOSE & FITTINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. CRABTREE
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?