CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00789
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 AMENDED Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Philpott, Romney) Modified text and added docket entry relationship on 7/8/2019 (tth).
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, SIERRA CLUB . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D)(Wolf, Douglas) Modified on 6/24/2019 to add additional filer (jf).
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Najjar, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Najjar, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (Wolf, Douglas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (Wolf, Douglas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Wakefield Wolf on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wolf, Douglas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Najjar, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Najjar, Jennifer)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2019.) (Snape, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ashley Najjar on behalf of All Defendants (Najjar, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/08/2019. (lcrcl3)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lisa T. Belenky, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway St, Suite 800, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 5108447107. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6041949. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William)
April 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #7 MOTION for Order Pro Hac Vice Admission Re: Lisa Belenky was entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event (Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) and pay the filing fee. (znmw)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Order Pro Hac Vice Admission Re: Lisa Belenky by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS, UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) Modified on 4/4/2019 (znmw).
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLORADO RIVERKEEPER. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIVING RIVERS. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014017) filed by UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, COLORADO RIVERKEEPER, LIVING RIVERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BuRec, #3 Summons Interior, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Declaration Rule 26 (CBD), #7 Declaration Rule 26 (Living Rivers), #8 Declaration Rule 26 (Colorado Riverkeeper), #9 Declaration Rule 26 (Utah Rivers Council))(Snape, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVING RIVERS
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Douglas Wakefield Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTAH RIVERS COUNCIL
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Douglas Wakefield Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLORADO RIVERKEEPER
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Douglas Wakefield Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Douglas Wakefield Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: William John Snape, III
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Douglas Wakefield Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Jennifer Ashley Najjar
Represented By: Romney Sharpe Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BUREAU OF RECLAMATION
Represented By: Jennifer Ashley Najjar
Represented By: Romney Sharpe Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?