PENNINGTON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: TAMARA STOUT, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, JOSEPH RICHARD, III, ABIGAIL CUKA, WILLIAM THORNE, ALICIA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, TAYLOR BROWN, LYLE BROOKS, LUCY RIGBY, MELISSA KAY CUKA, WANDA SUE MERRILL, COLLEEN SCHILD, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DANIEL CUKA, DEVIN IGO, GINA WRIGHT, MANUEL AGUILAR, ASHLEA LEWIS, LANITA HERLEM, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, DANIELLE EGLI, RUDY MESA, KEVYN PEREZ, JOANNA HARRIS, CALLIE MCGEE, SCOTT BROWN, WILLIAM STOUT, VELIA F. MESA, ADAM EGLI, K. E., COREY SCHLENKER, JONATHAN EDDS, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, AMBER PIRANEO, ASHLEY LEWIS, JASON MERRILL, D. A., DIANE PENNINGTON, VELIA A. MESA, B. E., MELINDA IGO, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH, J. H., LUIS AGUILAR, ALYSSA MERRILL, A. M. C., BLAKE HARRIS, TIMOTHY MERRILL, BRYANT HERLEM and ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Not Yet Classified: HOWARD ALLEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00796
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Russell Budd, :Firm- Baron & Budd, :Address- 3102 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75219. Phone No. - 214-521-3605. Fax No. - 214-521-1181 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6255255. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Driscoll, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (ztd); (Documents returned to counsel: John J. Driscoll THE DRISCOLL FIRM, P.C. 211 N. Broadway Suite 4050 (40TH FLOOR) St. Louis, MO 63102
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/3/19, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 DHL scheduled pick up confirmation) (ztd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST from Plaintiff's for the Clerk to effect service upon defendant of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (ztd); (See docket entry no. #9 to view document.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH. (Driscoll, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 5/30/2019, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Edward Betancourt, Director, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison Overseas Citizens Services, 2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, 4th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Attachment: #1 Exhibit FedEx Waybill) (tth) (Main Document 8 replaced on 5/30/2019 to correct the method of mailing) (ztth).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST from D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH for the Clerk to effect service of two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (See Docket Entry #6 to view documents). (tth)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH. (Driscoll, John)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH. (Driscoll, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (ztth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by D. A., LUIS AGUILAR, MANUEL AGUILAR, HOWARD ALLEN, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, LYLE BROOKS, SCOTT BROWN, TAYLOR BROWN, A. M. C., ABIGAIL CUKA, DANIEL CUKA, MELISSA KAY CUKA, B. E., K. E., JONATHAN EDDS, ADAM EGLI, DANIELLE EGLI, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., BLAKE HARRIS, JOANNA HARRIS, BRYANT HERLEM, LANITA HERLEM, ALICIA IGO, DEVIN IGO, MELINDA IGO, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, ASHLEA LEWIS, ASHLEY LEWIS, CALLIE MCGEE, ALYSSA MERRILL, JASON MERRILL, TIMOTHY MERRILL, WANDA SUE MERRILL, RUDY MESA, VELIA F. MESA, VELIA A. MESA, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, DIANE PENNINGTON, KEVYN PEREZ, AMBER PIRANEO, JOSEPH RICHARD, III, LUCY RIGBY, COLLEEN SCHILD, COREY SCHLENKER, TAMARA STOUT, WILLIAM STOUT, WILLIAM THORNE, GINA WRIGHT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Case Caption with Addresses)(Driscoll, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014923) filed by MELINDA IGO, ALICIA IGO, WANDA SUE MERRILL, LANITA HERLEM, LYLE BROOKS, COREY SCHLENKER, D. A., DIANE PENNINGTON, WILLIAM THORNE, CALLIE MCGEE, MANUEL AGUILAR, ADAM EGLI, KEVYN PEREZ, FAYE MROCZKOWSKI, WILLIAM STOUT, KIMBERLY YARBROUGH, LUCY RIGBY, JASON MERRILL, JONATHAN EDDS, ASHLEA LEWIS, BRYANT HERLEM, STEPHANIE BENEFIELD, DEVIN IGO, VELIA F. MESA, LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY, SCOTT BROWN, ALYSSA MERRILL, K. E., AMBER PIRANEO, VELIA A. MESA, TAMARA STOUT, COLLEEN SCHILD, MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN, J. H., GINA WRIGHT, MELISSA KAY CUKA, JOSEPH RICHARD, III, DANIEL CUKA, RUDY MESA, TAYLOR BROWN, B. E., LUIS AGUILAR, HOWARD ALLEN, BLAKE HARRIS, ABIGAIL CUKA, ASHLEY LEWIS, DANIELLE EGLI, JOANNA HARRIS, TIMOTHY MERRILL, RACHEL LAMBRIGHT, A. M. C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Driscoll, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNINGTON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA STOUT
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL LAMBRIGHT
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RICHARD, III
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABIGAIL CUKA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THORNE
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA IGO
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA RUSSELL KENNEDY
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR BROWN
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYLE BROOKS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY RIGBY
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA KAY CUKA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA SUE MERRILL
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEEN SCHILD
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAYE MROCZKOWSKI
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CUKA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN IGO
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA WRIGHT
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL AGUILAR
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEA LEWIS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANITA HERLEM
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE BENEFIELD
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE EGLI
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDY MESA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVYN PEREZ
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA HARRIS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALLIE MCGEE
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT BROWN
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM STOUT
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VELIA F. MESA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM EGLI
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. E.
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY SCHLENKER
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN EDDS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE SHANTEL GREEN
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER PIRANEO
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY LEWIS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON MERRILL
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. A.
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE PENNINGTON
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VELIA A. MESA
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. E.
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA IGO
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY YARBROUGH
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS AGUILAR
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYSSA MERRILL
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M. C.
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE HARRIS
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MERRILL
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYANT HERLEM
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOSEPH RICHARD, III
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOWARD ALLEN
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?