SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS INC. v. TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURNANCE LIMITED
Plaintiff: SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Defendant: TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURANCE LIMITED
Case Number: 1:2019cv00799
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Receipt on 04/10/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 8:19-cv-01083 sent by District of Maryland. (zrdj)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Maryland, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/01/2019. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd).
April 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 4/10/2001. (dot)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to change venue, Dkt. 6, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be transferred, in the interest of justice, to the U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/1/2019. (lcrdm3, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #5 to view.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. re Order,, (Ahalt, Brent)
March 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's notice to the Court due by 3/29/2019. (kt)
March 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff alleges in the complaint that venue is proper because "a substantial part of the events and acts or omissions giving rise to these claims occurred in this District[,]... [i]n particular, the property that is the subject matter of the insurance policy at issue is located in Prince George's County, Maryland." Dkt. 1 at 2 (Compl.). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Court on or before March 29, 2019, verifying that it intended to file in this district. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2019. (lcrdm3, )
March 22, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURANCE LIMITED. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2019. (lcrdm3, )
March 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. filed by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC..(Ahalt, Brent)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Ahalt, Brent)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. against TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURANCE LIMITED with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015602) filed by SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahalt, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS INC. v. TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURNANCE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOKIO MARINE KILN INSURANCE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNC-LAVALIN CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: Brent M. Ahalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?