KHODORKOVSKAYA v. GAY et al
Plaintiff: Inna Khodorkovskaya
Defendant: Jacquelyn G. Gay and KENNETH K. LIN
Not Yet Classified: Kenneth K Lin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00809
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 8(a) filed by JACQUELYN G. GAY. (Wahl, Barbara)
June 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/19/2019. (zcal)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #12 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. The defendant shall file her reply on or before June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 11, 2019. (lcdlf2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 8(a) by JACQUELYN G. GAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 8(a) filed by INNA KHODORKOVSKAYA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Boyle, Dennis)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by INNA KHODORKOVSKAYA. KENNETH K. LIN waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Boyle, Dennis)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 8(a) by JACQUELYN G. GAY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit 1-H, #10 Exhibit 1-I, #11 Exhibit 1-J, #12 Exhibit 1-K, #13 Exhibit 1-L, #14 Exhibit 1-M, #15 Exhibit 1-N, #16 Exhibit 1-O, #17 Exhibit 2, #18 Exhibit 3)(Wahl, Barbara)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Blerina Jasari on behalf of INNA KHODORKOVSKAYA (Jasari, Blerina)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Dearington on behalf of JACQUELYN G. GAY (Dearington, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 5/24/2019. (zcdw)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #6 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 30, 2019. (lcdlf2)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JACQUELYN G. GAY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motin for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara S. Wahl on behalf of JACQUELYN G. GAY (Wahl, Barbara)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to KENNETH K. LIN (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INNA KHODORKOVSKAYA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Summons)(Boyle, Dennis)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to JACQUELYN G. GAY, KENNETH K. LIN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacquelyn G. Gay, Kenneth K Lin with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6017482) filed by Inna Khodorkovskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Boyle, Dennis) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/25/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHODORKOVSKAYA v. GAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn G. Gay
Represented By: Michael F. Dearington
Represented By: Barbara S. Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH K. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inna Khodorkovskaya
Represented By: Dennis E. Boyle
Represented By: Blerina Jasari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kenneth K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?