JORDAN v. DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Harry James Jordan and HARRY J. JORDAN
Defendant: Wright DiskinsonWright, Michael Vartanian, Jeffrey Craven, MICHAEL A. VARTANIAN and DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00829
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HARRY J. JORDAN (Jordan, Harry)
April 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Amended Complaint; emailed to hjjlaw@msn.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Should you want summons reissued for any new party, you must resubmit the form (zjf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by HARRY J. JORDAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jordan, Harry)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JEFFREY CRAVEN, DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC, MICHAEL A. VARTANIAN. (ztd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by HARRY J. JORDAN. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by HARRY J. JORDAN.(Jordan, Harry)
March 26, 2019 SUMMONS (3) Not Issued as to JEFFREY CRAVEN, DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC, MICHAEL A. VARTANIAN. (zef, )
March 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jordan against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4616097308) filed by Harry James Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jordan, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN v. DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright DiskinsonWright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vartanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A. VARTANIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICKINSON WRIGHT PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry James Jordan
Represented By: Harry James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY J. JORDAN
Represented By: Harry James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?