SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, APRIL VERRETT, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, THOMAS LAMARTINA, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, DAVID HUERTA, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, CRAREY INGA, EDWARD J. MANKO, KEVIN MCGARR, FRANK A. MAXSON and INGA CRAREY
Defendant: BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE and BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00833
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC (ztd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT as to Defendant Bayville Healthcare, LLC by STEPHEN ALBRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT. (Watts, Matthew)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Watts, Matthew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Bardes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bardes, Diana)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6020407) filed by APRIL VERRETT, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, RODERICK S. BASHIR, EDWARD J. MANKO, CRAREY INGA, KEVIN MCGARR, STEPHEN ALBRECHT, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, EMANUEL PASTREICH, THOMAS LAMARTINA, FRANK A. MAXSON, DAVID HUERTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Watts, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE D/B/A CRYSTAL LAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVILLE HEALTHCARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL VERRETT
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ALBRECHT
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAREY INGA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGARR
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA CRAREY
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?