NGUYEN v. VU et al

Plaintiff: Quang Nguyen
Defendant: Global Financial Group, Inc., Global Real Estate Management, Inc. and Kimberly Vu
Case Number: 1:2019cv00894
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response and Status Report due by 7/16/2019. Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 7/23/2019. (kh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the defendants shall file their response to the plaintiff's #13 Partial Motion to Dismiss on or before July 16, 2019. The Court is not inclined to entertain any other requests for extensions of any deadlines moving forward absent extraordinary circumstances. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file a status report on or before July 16, 2019 informing the Court whether the defendants have been able to retain new counsel, at which point the Court will consider the #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for All Defendants. Given that the defendants are in the process of retaining new counsel and a responsive filing deadline will occur shortly, the court DENIES the plaintiff's #15 Motion for Scheduling Order as premature. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in accordance with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 and file, on or before July 23, 2019, a joint meet and confer report as set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After receiving the joint meet and confer report, the Court will set a scheduling conference unless the Court determines, on the basis of the report, that a conference is unnecessary. See Local Civil Rule 16.4. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2019. (lcdlf3)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Scheduling Order by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Moon, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for all Defendants by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by QUANG NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Counterclaim #11 by QUANG NGUYEN.(Moon, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against QUANG NGUYEN by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU.(Pels, Jon)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Moon, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Moon, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIMBERLY VU served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Moon, David)
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/21/2019. (zcal)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 21, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file proof of service with the Clerk of Court, in accordance with Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 20, 2019. (lcdlf3)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pels, Jon)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon D. Pels on behalf of All Defendants (Pels, Jon)
May 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other responsive pleading due by 5/17/2019. (kh)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 17, 2019. The Court is not inclined to grant any further extensions of time for the answer or other responsive pleading. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the defendant's address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 10, 2019. (lcdlf3)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by QUANG NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orr, Amber)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KIMBERLY VU. (tth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GLOBAL FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., GLOBAL REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KIMBERLY VU. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
March 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Taliah Orr on behalf of Quang Nguyen (Orr, Amber)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028798) filed by Quang Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Moon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGUYEN v. VU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jon D. Pels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Real Estate Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jon D. Pels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Vu
Represented By: Jon D. Pels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quang Nguyen
Represented By: Amber Taliah Orr
Represented By: David M.E. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?