PATTERSON v. HARRIS et al
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Defendant: MICHAEL DUGGAN, JEFFREY ATKINS, SCOTT S. HARRIS, DAVID J. SMITH, ROBERT N. SCOLA, JR.,, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ELIZABETH WARREN, REDMOND K. BARNES, ANGELA E. NOBLE, JOHN E. STEELE and ROBIN S. ROSENBAUM
Case Number: 1:2019cv00897
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to the Court by DIMITRI PATTERSON (jf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by DIMITRI PATTERSON (jf)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/31/2019. (znbn)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file a response to the Amended Complaint by July 31, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/20/2019. (lcjeb2)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint, by JEFFREY ATKINS, REDMOND K. BARNES, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA E. NOBLE, ROBIN S. ROSENBAUM, ROBERT N. SCOLA, JR, DAVID J. SMITH, JOHN E. STEELE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ELIZABETH WARREN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Given the filing of Plaintiff's #12 Amended Complaint, the Court ORDERS that Defendants' #8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. Defendants shall file a response to the Amended Complaint by July 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/17/2019. (lcjeb2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DAVID J. SMITH, REDMOND K. BARNES, ANGELA E. NOBLE, ELIZABETH WARREN, JOHN E. STEELE, ROBERT N. SCOLA, JR, ROBIN S. ROSENBAUM filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. "Leave to file GRANTED," signed by Judge James E. Boasbrg on 6/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ztd) Modified to add fiat on 6/20/2019 (znmw).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Defendant's Addresses by DIMITRI PATTERSON (ztd)
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/18/2019. (znbn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' #8 Motion to Dismiss on or before June 18, 2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/28/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schaefer, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. The Court will take Judicial Notice of the documents attached to Plaintiff's Motion. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/14/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/24/2019 (lsj)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Government shall file its response to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by May 24, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/13/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by DIMITRI PATTERSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/9/2019. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachment) (tth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by DIMITRI PATTERSON (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachment); "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/22/2019. (tth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEFFREY ATKINS served on 3/29/2019; MICHAEL DUGGAN served on 3/29/2019; SCOTT S. HARRIS served on 3/29/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/3/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/3/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/2/2019.) (ztd)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #2 Motion is DENIED as to the Request for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/8/2019. (lcjeb3)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Appendix - A) "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/3/2019. (tth)
March 29, 2019 Summons (5) Issued as to JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS., SUMMONS Issued as to JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ATKINS, MICHAEL DUGGAN, SCOTT S. HARRIS (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097354) with Jury Demand filed by DIMITRI PATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATTERSON v. HARRIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DUGGAN
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY ATKINS
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT S. HARRIS
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. SMITH
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT N. SCOLA, JR.,
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WARREN
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDMOND K. BARNES
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA E. NOBLE
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. STEELE
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN S. ROSENBAUM
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIMITRI PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?