UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018
Case Number: 1:2019cv00909
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE, granting #7 Motion for Default Judgment and Final Order of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/11/19. (gdf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment and for Final Order of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lucas, Diane). Added MOTION for Final Order Forfeiture on 6/28/2019 (jf).
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018 (jf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lucas, Diane)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed on 04/03/2019. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lucas, Diane)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed on 04/03/2019. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lucas, Diane)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem Issued Electronically. (zef, )
April 1, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Summons Not Issued was entered in error. (zef, )
April 1, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS Not Issued as to $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018. (zef, ) Modified on 4/1/2019 (zef, ).
April 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018 FROM AN ACCOUNT HELD IN THE NAME OF MICHAEL BROOKER (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucas, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $548,906.86 SEIZED ON OR ABOUT AUGUST 15, 2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Diane G. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?