GARDINER et al v. BOZUTTO GROUP, INC. et al

Plaintiff: TARA GARDINER and JAMES GARDINER
Defendant: BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, THE BOZUTTO GROUP, INC. and BOZUTTO GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00920
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY.(Boyce, Dawn)
June 26, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed by JAMES GARDINER, TARA GARDINER.(zrdj)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's #9 Unopposed Motion to File Amended Complaint and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to docket the plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. 9-1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 19, 2019. (lcbah1)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by JAMES GARDINER, TARA GARDINER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Comparison to Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Cohn, Joel)
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosures due by 6/17/2019; Amended Pleadings/Joinder of parties due by 6/21/2019; Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Statement due by 8/15/2019; Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Statement due by 9/16/2019; Plaintiff's rebuttal witnesses due by 10/1/2019; Discovery due by 10/25/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2019; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2019; Replies to Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019. (tg)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the #8 Joint Statement of Parties' LCvR 16.3 Planning Conference, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by June 17, 2019, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1); (2) by June 21, 2019, the parties shall make any amendments to the pleadings and join any additional parties; (3) by August 15, 2019, the plaintiff shall disclose any expert witnesses as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (4) by September 16, 2019, the defendant shall disclose any expert witnesses as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (5) by October 1, 2019, the plaintiff shall disclose any rebuttal expert witnesses as required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (6) by October 25, 2019, all discovery shall close, on which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court whether (a) the parties request referral for mediation or settlement, (b) the parties request a date for a pretrial conference, or (c) dispositive motions are anticipated; (7) by November 22, 2019, the parties shall file any dispositive motions; (8) by December 13, 2019, the parties shall file any oppositions to dispositive motions; (6) by December 20, 2019, the parties shall file any replies in support of dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 17, 2019. (lcbah1)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT Joint Statement of Parties' LCvR 16.3 Planning Conference by BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Boyce, Dawn) Modified event title on 5/21/2019 (znmw).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant Bozzuto Group, Inc.'s #7 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss the Bozzuto Group, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 24, 2019. (lcbah1)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss The Bozzuto Group, Inc. by BOZUTTO GROUP, INC. (Bragdon, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Boyce, Dawn)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY.(Boyce, Dawn)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 3, 2019. (lcbah1)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BOZUTTO GROUP, INC., BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by JAMES GARDINER, TARA GARDINER #1 Complaint, filed by TARA GARDINER, JAMES GARDINER. (Cohn, Joel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, THE BOZUTTO GROUP, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6035338) filed by TARA GARDINER, JAMES GARDINER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Cohn, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARDINER et al v. BOZUTTO GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA GARDINER
Represented By: Joel M. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GARDINER
Represented By: Joel M. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOZUTTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Dawn E. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOZUTTO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOZUTTO GROUP, INC.
Represented By: James D. Bragdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?