FAHEY v. NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: A. Kevin Fahey
Defendant: New England Coffee Company and Reily Foods Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00950
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 19 Pay Attorney Membership Renewal Fees was entered in error and filed in the correct renewal case 19mc9999 for Attorney Renewal & Fees case. (zad)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Governing Class Certification by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Schedule on class certification discovery and briefing due by 7/1/2019. (kt)
June 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to continue class certification briefing, Dkt. 18, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint schedule to the Court on class certification discovery and briefing on or before July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/9/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue Class Certification Briefing Deadlines by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts I and III. Case continues on Count II by A. KEVIN FAHEY. (Willcox, Thomas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Certify Class by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support)(Willcox, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casey, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss on or before 5/22/2019. (kt)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the unopposed motion for an extension of time, Dkt. 14, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2019. (lcrdm2, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by A. KEVIN FAHEY. (Willcox, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before 5/10/2019. (kt)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time, Dkt. 12, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/9/2019. (lcrdm2, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Willcox, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motions for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. 9, 10, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. Mark A. Cunningham and John R. Guenard may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/12/2019. (lcrdm2, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John R. Guenard, :Firm- Jones Walker LLP, :Address- 201 St. Charles Ave., 49th Floor, New Orleans, LA 70170. Phone No. - 504-582-8100. Fax No. - 504-589-8100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6054186. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark A. Cunningham, :Firm- Jones Walker LLP, :Address- 201 St. Charles Ave., 50th Floor, New Orleans, LA 70170. Phone No. - 504-582-8536. Fax No. - 504-589-8536 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6054160. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 4/24/2019. (kt)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time, Dkt. 8, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2019. (lcrdm2, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt.6, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Thomas A. Casey, Jr. may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/8/2019. (lcrdm2, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas A. Casey, Jr., :Firm- Jones Walker LLP, :Address- 201 St. Charles Ave., 49th Floor, New Orleans, LA 70170. Phone No. - 504-582-8294. Fax No. - 504-582-8011 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6045838. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/5/2019. (lcrdm2, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA Notice of Removal by NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY, REILY FOODS COMPANY. (Breckinridge, Alexander)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
April 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 18-2055 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEAL FOR THE FIRST CIRCUIT. (zef, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019-CA-001465 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6039767 filed by New England Coffee Company, Reily Foods Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party)(Breckinridge, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAHEY v. NEW ENGLAND COFFEE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Kevin Fahey
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Coffee Company
Represented By: Alexander N. Breckinridge
Represented By: John R. Guenard
Represented By: Thomas A. Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Mark A. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reily Foods Company
Represented By: Alexander N. Breckinridge
Represented By: John R. Guenard
Represented By: Thomas A. Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Mark A. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?