HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL, PROSPECT DCMH, LLC, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, PENN STATE HEATLH, THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC., HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, COOLEY DICKINSON HOSPITAL, INC., BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO, MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL, BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC., BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC., BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL, PROSPECT DCMH, LLC doing business as DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH IMMANUEL, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC. doing business as JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTH doing business as JEWISH HOSPITAL SHELBYVILLE, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH ST. FRANCIS, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA doing business as CHI HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL LONDON doing business as SAINT JOSEPH EAST doing business as SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL, PENN STATE HEATLH doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH ST. ELIZABETH, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO doing business as PENROSE/ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE doing business as ST. ANTHONY CENTRAL doing business as ST. ANTHONY NORTH doing business as ST. MARY CORWIN MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CHI HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL doing business as ST. CLARE HOSPITAL doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP. doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER - DES MOINES, BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FAULKNER HOSPITAL, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI ST. ALEXIUS HEALTH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC doing business as CROZER CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as CHI HEALTH MERCY COUNCIL BLUFFS doing business as BERGAN MERCY MEDICAL CENTER and ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ST. VINCENT NORTH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv00964
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Cases Consolidated pursuant to Order filed 04/24/2019. All documents are to be filed ONLY in lead case 17cv1134. (jf)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER consolidating case with Albert Einstein Healthcare Network v. Azar, 1:17-cv-1134-ABJ. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/24/19. (DMK)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Objection to Consolidation by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by 4/30/2019 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. (jth)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by April 30, 2019 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/16/19. (DMK)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/15/2019. (Keough, Christopher)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/15/2019 (Keough, Christopher)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, COOLEY DICKINSON HOSPITAL, INC., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PENN STATE HEATLH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, PROSPECT DCMH, LLC, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC., THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC., THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO, THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1134. (Keough, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, COOLEY DICKINSON HOSPITAL, INC., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PENN STATE HEATLH, PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, PROSPECT DCMH, LLC, SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC., THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC., THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO, THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL (Keough, Christopher)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6043007) filed by PROSPECT CCMC, LLC, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC., HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, COOLEY DICKINSON HOSPITAL, INC., ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER, PENN STATE HEATLH, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC., SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, PROSPECT DCMH, LLC, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Keough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT DCMH, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT CCMC, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENN STATE HEATLH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOLEY DICKINSON HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as BETHESDA NORTH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT DCMH, LLC doing business as DELAWARE COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH IMMANUEL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC. doing business as JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTH doing business as JEWISH HOSPITAL SHELBYVILLE
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH ST. FRANCIS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA doing business as CHI HEALTH GOOD SAMARITAN
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL LONDON doing business as SAINT JOSEPH EAST doing business as SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENN STATE HEATLH doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ELIZABETH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI HEALTH ST. ELIZABETH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO doing business as PENROSE/ST. FRANCIS HEALTHCARE doing business as ST. ANTHONY CENTRAL doing business as ST. ANTHONY NORTH doing business as ST. MARY CORWIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL OF CINCINNATI, OHIO doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CHI HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL doing business as ST. CLARE HOSPITAL doing business as ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL doing business as ST. JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP. doing business as MERCY MEDICAL CENTER - DES MOINES
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S FAULKNER HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FAULKNER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CHI ST. ALEXIUS HEALTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT CCMC, LLC doing business as CROZER CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM doing business as CHI HEALTH MERCY COUNCIL BLUFFS doing business as BERGAN MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. VINCENT INFIRMARY MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ST. VINCENT NORTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?