CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al

Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD
Defendant: NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION and UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00965
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 7/16/2019. (dot)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/19/2019. (lcckk3)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Seabrook, April)
May 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/18/2019. (dot)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Currently, Defendants' Answer is due May 17, 2019. Defense counsel requests an extension of thirty days due to the complex nature of the subject matter of the FOIA request, the need to confer with agency-Defendants, and other litigation commitments. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to submit their Answer by JUNE 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/14/2019. (lcckk3)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Seabrook, April)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elaine Meckenstock on behalf of CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD (Meckenstock, Margaret)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/12/19. (DM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6043290) filed by CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, #3 Summons Summons to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, #4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Hoffman, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6043290) filed by CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, # 3 Summons Summons to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, # 4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Hoffman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD
Represented By: Ryan Robert Hoffman
Represented By: Margaret Elaine Meckenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?