JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00993
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction of Attorney Address by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC (Cavanaugh, Anthony)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC. (Cavanaugh, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/10/2019. (zdf)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, and V of the Amended Complaint: UPON CONSIDERATION of the Consent Motion to Extend Time to File an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff has until July 10, 2019, to file an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 20, 2019. (AG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, and V of the Amended Complaint by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavanaugh, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 12, 2019. (AG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, Counts I and II by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Gambino, Michelle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, and V of the Amended Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambino, Michelle)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: UPON CONSIDERATION of the Consent Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant has until June 11, 2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 28, 2019. (AG)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint, by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambino, Michelle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Amended Complaint (Cavanaugh, Anthony) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. filed by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Email (1/14/19), #3 Exhibit C - Letter (1/28/19), #4 Exhibit D - Letter (4/2/19))(Cavanaugh, Anthony)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019 (Murphy, Meaghan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan Colleen Murphy on behalf of JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC (Murphy, Meaghan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6049702) filed by JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Disclosure Statement, #7 Summons)(Cavanaugh, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Michelle DeFinis Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CAMPBELL COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Anthony Fitzmichael Cavanaugh
Represented By: Meaghan Colleen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?