MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. v. MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC.
Defendant: MOPHSF HOLDINGS, LLC and MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00996
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
April 24, 2019 Cases consolidated. Cases 19cv179 and 19cv996 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered on 4/24/2019. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead case, Civil Action No. 19cv179. The parties are advised NOT to select SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing. (tth)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause seeking a preliminary injunction filed by MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Declaration of Douglas J. Greenlaw, #2 Exhibit Amended and Restated Articles of Incorporation of Military Order of the Purple Heart Service Foundation, Inc., #3 Exhibit Military Times Article)(Herrick, Steven) Modified on 4/24/2019 to correct docket link (jf).
April 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Telephone Conference held on 4/19/2019. Brief due by 4/23/2019. Response To Brief due by 4/27/2019. (Court Reporter SARA WICK.) (mac)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lee Sturm on behalf of All Defendants (Sturm, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew B. Tully on behalf of MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. (Tully, Mathew)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Herrick on behalf of MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. (Herrick, Steven)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Yaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Yaffe, Eric)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER scheduling a telephonic status conference at 3 p.m. on April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 16, 2019. (lcdlf2)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC., MOPHSF HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC.. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-179-DLF. (zef, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. (Fallings, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause seeking a preliminary injunction, MOTION to Appoint Receiver by MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Fallings, Michael) Modified to add "seeking a preliminary injunction" on 4/11/2019 (zef, ). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/15/2019 (znmw). (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/15/2019) (znmw). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/15/2019) (znmw). Added MOTION to Appoint Receiver on 4/24/2019 (jf).
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC., MOPHSF HOLDINGS, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6050287) filed by MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons-Foundation, #2 Summons Summons-Holding Company, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Rule 40.5(b)(2) related cases form)(Fallings, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC. v. MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOPHSF HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Yaffe
Represented By: Michael Lee Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART SERVICE FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Eric L. Yaffe
Represented By: Michael Lee Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILITARY ORDER OF THE PURPLE HEART OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Michael C. Fallings
Represented By: Steven L. Herrick
Represented By: Mathew B. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?