MACDONALD v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Plaintiff: PAMELA MACDONALD
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON and PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01000
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Receipt of Electronic Transfer; Other Court Number 3:19-cv-14242 sent by New Jersey. (ztnr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey, pursuant to the Court Order entered 6/17/19. Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 EMAIL dated 6/19/2019 from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) dated 6/17/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (tth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further action from the Court or transfer by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties are relieved of any pleading, discovery, or other obligation until further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pending a ruling on such transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 15, 2019. (lcrc2)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coots Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(Coots, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PAMELA MACDONALD. Case related to Case No. 1:19-cv-0934 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6050849) filed by PAMELA MACDONALD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACDONALD v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA MACDONALD
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?