STARK III v. SWIFT et al

Plaintiff: WILFRED MICHAEL STARK III
Defendant: TYLER DEVER, THE FREE BEACON, JAMES DAMORE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, RYAN KELLER, ADAM LEXALT, FREE OUR INTERNET, HEATHER SWIFT, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, CHAD WILKERSON, JOSEPH BROWN, AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL, ROBERT LIST, ED GILLESPIE, STEPHEN PEUTZ, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION, THE REPUBLICAN STANDARD, KRISTIN DAVISON, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, THE WASHINGTON EXAMINER, THE DAILY CALLER, CHRISTIE-LEE MCNALLY, REPUBLICAN STANDARD, WASHINGTON EXAMINER, FREE BEACON and DAILY CALLER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01010
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DAILY CALLER. (Funk, Katherine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Pittman, Nathan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by ED GILLESPIE, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION. (Pittman, Nathan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TYLER DEVER, AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL, HEATHER SWIFT. (Cohen, Jason)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REPUBLICAN STANDARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, J.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #22 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WILFRED MICHAEL STARK III. "LET THIS BE FILED" signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/01/2019 (jf)
June 29, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to opposition to motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOSEPH BROWN, RYAN KELLER, ADAM LEXALT, ROBERT LIST, STEPHEN PEUTZ. (Torchinsky, Jason)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 7/12/2019. (zjd)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER advising Plaintiffs to respond by July 12, 2019, to Defendants' #24 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/12/2019. (lcapm2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TYLER DEVER, AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL, HEATHER SWIFT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Jared Slade, #2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Sarah Clouse)(Cohen, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 6/21/2019. (zjd)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by June 21, 2019, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 20, 21, 22 or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/21/2019. (lcapm2)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by DAILY CALLER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Funk, Katherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittman, Nathan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by ED GILLESPIE, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittman, Nathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine I. Funk on behalf of DAILY CALLER (Funk, Katherine)
April 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/27/2019. (zjd)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER advising Plaintiffs to respond by May 27, 2019, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/25/2019. (lcapm2)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REPUBLICAN STANDARD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit)(Petersen, J.) Modified event title on 5/10/2019 (znmw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by ADAM LEXALT, ROBERT LIST, STEPHEN PEUTZ, RYAN KELLER, JOSEPH BROWN (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Torchinsky, Jason) Modified to add filers on 5/10/2019 (znmw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by RYAN KELLER, JOSEPH BROWN, ADAM LEXALT, STEPHEN PEUTZ, ROBERT LIST (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Torchinsky, Jason) Modified to add filers on 5/10/2019 (znmw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH BROWN, ADAM LAXALT, ROBERT LIST, STEPHEN PUETZ, RYAN KELLER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Torchinsky, Jason) Modified to add filers on 5/10/2019 (znmw).
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REPUBLICAN STANDARD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, J.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Chapman Petersen on behalf of REPUBLICAN STANDARD (Petersen, J.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Torchinsky on behalf of STEPHEN PEUTZ (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Torchinsky on behalf of ROBERT LIST (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Torchinsky on behalf of ADAM LEXALT (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Torchinsky on behalf of RYAN KELLER (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Torchinsky on behalf of JOSEPH BROWN (Torchinsky, Jason)
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants, the Republican National Committee, the National Republican Congressional Committee, the National Republican Senate Committee, the Republican Governors Association, and Ed Gillespie answer due by 5/20/2019. Federal Defendants' Answer or Responsive Pleading shall be due by 6/10/2019. (tb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brian D. Schmalzbach is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendants Republican National Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senate Committee, Republican Governors Association, and Ed Gillespie. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/16/2019. (lcapm3) Modified to amend party names on 4/18/2019 (zjd).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Federal Defendants' #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Federal Defendants' Answer or Responsive Pleading shall be due on or before June 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/16/2019. (lcapm3)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. The Answer or Responsive Pleading for Defendants the Republican National Committee, the National Republican Congressional Committee, the National Republican Senate Committee, the Republican Governors Association, and Ed Gillespie shall be due on or before May 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/16/2019. (lcapm3)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by TYLER DEVER, AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL, HEATHER SWIFT (Cohen, Jason)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
April 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintff's Complaint by ED GILLESPIE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Order Granting Extension)(Pittman, Nathan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian D. Schmalzbach, :Firm- McGuireWoods LLP, :Address- 800 East Canal Street, Richmond Virginia, 23219. Phone No. - (804) 775-4746. Fax No. - (804) 698-2304 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6054731. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ED GILLESPIE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Pittman, Nathan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Robert Pittman on behalf of ED GILLESPIE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE, NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Pittman, Nathan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 001668 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by HEATHER SWIFT, AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL, TYLER DEVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARK III v. SWIFT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER DEVER
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FREE BEACON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES DAMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATE COMMITTEE
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach
Represented By: Nathan Robert Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN KELLER
Represented By: Jason B. Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM LEXALT
Represented By: Jason B. Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREE OUR INTERNET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER SWIFT
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach
Represented By: Nathan Robert Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BROWN
Represented By: Jason B. Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA KASTER-AVERILL
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LIST
Represented By: Jason B. Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED GILLESPIE
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach
Represented By: Nathan Robert Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN PEUTZ
Represented By: Jason B. Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLICAN GOVERNOR'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach
Represented By: Nathan Robert Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE REPUBLICAN STANDARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIN DAVISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Brian D. Schmalzbach
Represented By: Nathan Robert Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WASHINGTON EXAMINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DAILY CALLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIE-LEE MCNALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLICAN STANDARD
Represented By: J. Chapman Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON EXAMINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREE BEACON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAILY CALLER
Represented By: Katherine I. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILFRED MICHAEL STARK III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?