LEFKOWITZ et al v. LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. et al

Plaintiff: LEONARD LEFKOWITZ and SARADONA LEFKOWITZ
Defendant: LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. and CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv01016
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Case Remanded to Superior Court re #17 Order. (ztd)
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 6/2/2019. (tb)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER remanding case to the Superior Court of the District of Columbia. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/23/2019. (lcjdb2)
May 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2019. The parties are directed to file by 12:00 (noon) on 5/22/2019 any submissions regarding jurisdiction. If it is determined that jurisdiction is with this Court a scheduling order will be issued. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (jth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Regan, Patrick)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Ad Damnum by LEONARD LEFKOWITZ, SARADONA LEFKOWITZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Regan, Patrick)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., (Stolarz, Brian)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. by CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.,.(Stolarz, Brian)
April 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tg)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial scheduling conference is set for May 21, 2019, at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 30. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/29/2019. (lcjdb2)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by LONG FENCE COMPANY INC..(Awkward, G.)
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Consigli answer due by 5/2/2019. (tb)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #10 defendant Consigli Construction Co., Inc.'s consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant Consigli shall respond to the complaint by not later than May 2, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/19/2019. (lcjdb2)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stolarz, Brian)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 ERRATA Correcting Caption on the Notice of Removal by LONG FENCE COMPANY INC.. (Awkward, G.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Calvin Awkward, III on behalf of LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. (Awkward, G.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Regan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Regan, Christopher)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Michael Regan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Regan, Patrick)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
April 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent Removal by CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., (Stolarz, Brian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. Stolarz on behalf of CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC., (Stolarz, Brian)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. (Awkward, G.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 001469 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6054040 filed by LONG FENCE COMPANY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Initial Order & Addendum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Rogs & RPDs to Long Fence, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Rogs & RPDs to Consigli, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Notice to Take Depo of Long Fence, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Notice to Take Depo of Consigli, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - MD SDAT re Long Fence, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - MD SDAT re Consigli, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal in Superior Court, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Awkward, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEFKOWITZ et al v. LONG FENCE COMPANY INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONG FENCE COMPANY INC.
Represented By: G. Calvin Awkward, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSIGLI CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.,
Represented By: Brian W. Stolarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Represented By: Patrick Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARADONA LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Represented By: Patrick Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?